Sun et al v. Xu
Plaintiff: Ao Wang, Xingjian Sun and Xing Zhao
Defendant: Gary Gang Xu
Case Number: 2:2019cv02242
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Olivarius, Ann)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Olivarius, Ann)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Olivarius, Ann)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Olivarius, Ann)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 +++ SEALED MOTION by Plaintiffs Xingjian Sun, Ao Wang, Xing Zhao. Responses due by 11/20/2019 (Olivarius, Ann)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Alias Summons Issued as to Gary Gang Xu. (Fed Ex'd to Plaintiffs' counsel, Ali Wilkinson, using Fed Ex label provided by Plaintiffs.) (TC, ilcd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Paul Peter Hughes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hughes, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lee Daniel Trevis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Trevis, Lee)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Francis McAllister on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McAllister, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Alison F Wilkinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilkinson, Alison)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gary Gang Xu. (TC, ilcd) Modified on 9/10/2019 to correct defendant's name (KM, ilcd).
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3191436.), filed by Xingjian Sun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Interest, #4 Notice of Appearance)(Olivarius, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun et al v. Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gang Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ao Wang
Represented By: Paul Peter Hughes
Represented By: Ann McAllister Olivarius
Represented By: Jonathan Little
Represented By: Lee Daniel Trevis
Represented By: Jessica Wegg
Represented By: Alison F Wilkinson
Represented By: John Francis McAllister
Represented By: Jessica Ann Wegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xingjian Sun
Represented By: Paul Peter Hughes
Represented By: Ann McAllister Olivarius
Represented By: Jonathan Little
Represented By: Lee Daniel Trevis
Represented By: Jessica Wegg
Represented By: Alison F Wilkinson
Represented By: John Francis McAllister
Represented By: Jessica Ann Wegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xing Zhao
Represented By: Paul Peter Hughes
Represented By: Ann McAllister Olivarius
Represented By: Jonathan Little
Represented By: Lee Daniel Trevis
Represented By: Jessica Wegg
Represented By: Alison F Wilkinson
Represented By: John Francis McAllister
Represented By: Jessica Ann Wegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?