Crabtree v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patrick D Crabtree
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv02244
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/7/2019. The Order #4 granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees erroneously referred to docket entry #2 . The correct docket entry is #3 .(JMB, ilcd)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Patrick D Crabtree as to Commissioner of Social Security/US Attorney General on 10/1/2019. (JMB, ilcd)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/17/2019, answer due 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JMB, ilcd)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/17/2019. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees #2 is GRANTED. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Patrick D. Crabtree. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Schultz, Barry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Barry Schultz on behalf of Patrick D. Crabtree (Schultz, Barry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Patrick D. Crabtree. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 USM forms)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crabtree v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-URBANA SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick D Crabtree
Represented By: Barry Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?