Farrow Jr v. Department of Human Services
Petitioner: Paul Farrow, Jr
Respondent: Department of Human Services
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2019cv02246
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Leah M Bendik on behalf of Department of Human Services (Bendik, Leah)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/4/2019. Petitioner has now paid the $5.00 filing fee, so, his Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 is MOOT. Respondent shall file their answer to the Petition #1 within 60 days. See written order. (Response deadline set for 1/3/2020.) (JMB, ilcd) Modified on 11/5/19 to add deadline (TC, ilcd).
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Farrow, Jr from McFarland Mental Health to Vermilion County Jail. (KM, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00 received, receipt number 34626011693 (MAS, ilcd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Paul Raymond Farrow Jr. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (JMB, ilcd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Paul Raymond Farrow Jr.(JMB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrow Jr v. Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Human Services
Represented By: Leah M Bendik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Farrow, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?