Doorn v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Julie A Doorn
Defendant: C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02249
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-01421. .
September 6, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #8 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only) filed by Julie A Doorn. Document entered in wrong case. All pleadings must be filed in the lead case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Lynnette Simon Marshall filed by Lynnette Simon Marshall. (Marshall, Lynnette)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (REK) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 10, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $35, receipt number PHX171757 as to Robert B Warner. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
May 10, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $35, receipt number PHX171756 as to Lynnette Simon Marshall. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
May 9, 2016 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1421-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 9, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lynnette Simon Marshall by Julie A Doorn. (MAP)
May 9, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert B Warner by Julie A Doorn. (MAP)
May 9, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX171755 filed by Julie A Doorn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doorn v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A Doorn
Represented By: Robert Bruce Warner
Represented By: Lynnette Simon Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?