Hite v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Robert Hite
Defendant: C R Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02250
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas William Arbon on behalf of Robert Hite (Arbon, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Hildebrand, Daniel)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Timothy Jon Freiberg on behalf of Robert Hite (Freiberg, Timothy)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/22/2019. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #11 and the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is RESCHEDULED to 12/9/19 at 10:15 AM. The Court will initiate the call. (DS, ilcd)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/22/19. On 9/19/19, the Clerk sent Attorney Admission Paperwork to Attorney Ben Martin. As of the date of this order, Attorney Martin has not completed the admission process. The Court directs Attorney Martin to complete his admission process on or before 11/18/19. (Miscellaneous Deadline 11/18/19.) (TC, ilcd)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Hildebrand, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. (Hildebrand, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Richard North, Jr. to be replaced by Lori G. Cohen, Daniel G. Hildebrand, by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Hildebrand, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/25/2019. Defendants' Motion to Substitute Counsel #9 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to terminate attorney Richard North, Jr. from this case. (Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated) (DS, ilcd)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Monica Santana Harris on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Harris, Monica)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel G Hildebrand on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Hildebrand, Daniel)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/19/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-02875. .
September 6, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Central District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
August 25, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-2875-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 25, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14583060 filed by Robert Hite. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hite v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Daniel G Hildebrand
Represented By: Monica Santana Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Daniel G Hildebrand
Represented By: Monica Santana Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hite
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Timothy Jon Freiberg
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?