Burns v. State of Illinois, The et al
Plaintiff: Emanuel Demar Burns
Defendant: Jason Burse, Herscher, Kankakee Police Department, Jeffrey Voss, Officer Lacie Zingre, Jay Etzel, State of Illinois and City of Kankakee
Case Number: 2:2019cv02277
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/17/2019. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG, ilcd)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04353.
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division the electronic record. (ph, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court transfers this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division, for consideration of Plaintiff's complaint #1 , and for whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on October 17, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MEDICAL RECORDS by Emanuel Demar Burns. (Envelope postmarked 8/20/2019) (Received for docketing 8/29/2019) (Document does not contain case number) (ph, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 OPENING Brief by Emanuel Demar Burns. (Exhibits) (Envelope not postmarked) (ph, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 COPIES of Hospital Documents by Emanuel Demar Burns. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmark is illegible) (ph, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT by Emanuel Demar Burns. (Envelope postmark is illegible) (ph, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Emanuel Demar Burns. (Envelope postmarked 6/25/2019) (ph, ) Modified on 10/17/2019 to correct title (SAG, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. State of Illinois, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Burse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kankakee Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lacie Zingre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Etzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kankakee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Demar Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?