Torres v. Vermilion County Jail
Plaintiff: Gerardo Torres
Defendant: Vermilion County Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv02285
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG, ilcd)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 12/20/2019. Plaintiff was directed to pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis within 21 days. Text Order entered Oct. 25, 2019. Plaintiff failed to comply. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to follow court orders. All pending motions are denied as moot. Plaintiff remains responsible for the $400.00 filing fee. This case is closed.(SAG, ilcd)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, regarding Text Order entered 10/25/2019. (RL, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Plaintiff Gerardo Torres (SAG, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/25/2019. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vermilion County Jail, filed by Gerardo Torres. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Vermilion County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermilion County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?