Guardiola v. Entzel
Petitioner: Jesse Guardiola
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Case Number: 2:2019cv02287
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to US Atty Greggory Walters in receipt of #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Text Order. (VH, ilcd)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed upon FCI Pekin regarding 11/22/2019 Text Order. (RK, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/26/2019. Presentence investigation reports are confidential documents created by the United States Probation Office in order to assist a judge in crafting appropriate sentences. United States Dep't of Justice v. Julian, 486 U.S. 1, 12 (1988). These reports contain highly sensitive and personal information about defendants. As such, courts very rarely allow third parties to access them. As several courts have recognized, allowing the disclosure of presentence investigation reports has a chilling effect on the willingness of a defendant and other contributing sources to supply useful information to the probation officer compiling the report. E.g., Julian, 486 U.S. at 12. Given the nature of the document sought to be sealed, the Court hereby grants the motion to seal the portion of the appendix containing the presentence report. (JR, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Walters, Greggory)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Respondent Frederick Entzel. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Walters, Greggory)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Frederick Entzel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Walters, Greggory)
November 25, 2019 Set Deadline as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 1/6/2020. (VH, ilcd)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Petitioner has filed a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ). Pursuant to the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts (as applied to Section 2241 Petitions, see Rule 1(b)), the Court finds that it does not plainly appear from the face of the Petition that the Petitioner is not entitled to relief in the district court. The Clerk SHALL serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. #1 ) upon the Respondent. Respondent SHALL file an answer, motion, or other responsive pleading within forty-two (42) days of the entry of this Text Order. Respondent should address any facts which would establish whether Petitioner's claims are untimely or procedurally barred. In addition, Respondent should address the merits of Petitioner's claim and otherwise fully comply with Rule 5(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Proceedings for the United States District Courts. Petitioner MAY file a reply to Respondent's response within twenty-one (21) days of being served with the response. Petitioner SHALL serve upon the United States Attorney's office a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 11/22/2019. (JR, ilcd)
November 8, 2019 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626035631. (VH, ilcd)
October 29, 2019 Set Deadlines: Deficiencies to be remedied by 11/25/2019. (VH, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/28/2019. The Court notes Petitioner has filed a petition under 28 U.S.C. s. 2241 (Doc. 1) but has neither paid the applicable $5.00 filing fee nor submitted a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will postpone its requisite Rule 4 assessment of this Petition until Petitioner has either paid the filing fee or filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If Petitioner does not either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Text Order, his Petition will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (JR, ilcd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241, filed by Jesse Guardiola. (Attachments: #1 2241 petition, #2 envelope)(TK, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardiola v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frederick Entzel
Represented By: Greggory R Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Guardiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?