Washington v. Glenn et al
Plaintiff: Alexandria Annie Washington and Azmiyah Island Bey
Defendant: Charles A Montorio-Archer, James Glenn, Matthew Sullivan, Jerry Yoder, Marc D Smith, Marnita Yoder and Brian Bower
Case Number: 2:2019cv02297
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Circuit Rule 3(b) Fee Notice and ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandria Annie Washington (JMB, ilcd)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/6/2019. The Court certifies that the appeal is not in good faith. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis #11 is DENIED. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alexandria Annie Washington. Responses due by 12/19/2019 (JMB, ilcd)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandria Annie Washington. The Pro See Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is transferred to the US District Court. (JMB, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 3(b) Fee Notice and ORDER of USCA as to #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandria Annie Washington. (JMB, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandria Annie Washington. USCA Case Number 19-3289 (JMB, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (KM, ilcd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order by Alexandria Annie Washington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KM, ilcd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Remark: Complaint received from plaintiff in Springfield Office; duplicate of Complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed IFP, #2 Envelope). (KM, ilcd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT entered. (JMB, ilcd) Modified on 11/5/2019 to modify the language in the entry. (JMB, ilcd)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/1/2019. For the reasons stated in the order, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 is DENIED. Plaintiff's pro se Complaint []1] is DISMISSED. Civil Case Terminated. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alexandria Annie Washington. Responses due by 11/15/2019 (JMB, ilcd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alexandria Annie Washington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JMB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Glenn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Annie Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azmiyah Island Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A Montorio-Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marnita Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?