Brown v. Morger et al
Plaintiff: Steven Brown
Defendant: John Doe and . Morger
Case Number: 2:2019cv02308
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07379. .
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (mc, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division, for imposition of a filing fee and whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. The Clerk shall transfer the action forthwith. The case is terminated on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/12/2019. Mailed notice (mc, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Brown for attorney representation (mc, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Steven Brown for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (mc, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Steven Brown. (Exhbiits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 11/4/2019)(mc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Morger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Morger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?