Allen v. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Allen
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Inc, Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Depuy Synthes Sales Inc, Depuy International Ltd, Depuy Synthes Products Inc and Depuy Orthopaedics Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02326
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Synthes Inc, Depuy Synthes Products Inc, Depuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson.(Essig, William)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/10/20. The deadline for defendants Depuy Orthopaedics Inc; Depuy Synthes Inc; Depuy Synthes Products Inc; Depuy Synthes Sales Inc; Johnson & Johnson to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is 1/28/20. (KM, ilcd)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eddie Allen.(SKR, ilcd)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/7/20. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #14 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [14-1] instanter. The Court's Order to Show Cause #2 is DISCHARGED. (SKR, ilcd)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Eddie Allen. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Holland, Eric)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Eddie Allen re #2 Order to Show Cause, . (Holland, Eric)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Allen. Johnson & Johnson served on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Crompton, Randall)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Allen. Depuy Synthes Sales Inc served on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Crompton, Randall)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Allen. Depuy Synthes Products Inc served on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Crompton, Randall)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Allen. Depuy Synthes Inc served on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Crompton, Randall)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddie Allen. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc served on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Crompton, Randall)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Randall Seth Crompton on behalf of Eddie Allen (Crompton, Randall)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/2/2020. On 12/5/19, the Court entered an Order to Show Cause directing Plaintiff to show cause as to why this matter should not be dismissed for want of jurisdiction on or before 12/26/19. As of the date of this order, Plaintiff has not responded to the Order to Show Cause. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to file a response within 7 days. (JMB, ilcd)
December 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants' answer deadline reset to 1/30/20 per 12/26/19 Text Order. (TC, ilcd)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/26/2019. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #5 is GRANTED. Defendants Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., n/k/a, Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Depuy Synthes, Inc., Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc., and Johnson & Johnsons deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/30/20. (JMB, ilcd)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Synthes Inc, Depuy Synthes Products Inc, Depuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Essig, William)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Defendants Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Synthes Inc, Depuy Synthes Products Inc, Depuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (Essig, William)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William V Essig on behalf of Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Synthes Inc, Depuy Synthes Products Inc, Depuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Essig, William)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Depuy International Ltd, Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Synthes Inc, Depuy Synthes Products Inc, Depuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB, ilcd)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 *DISCHARGED* ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/5/2019. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause as to why this matter should not be dismissed for want of jurisdiction. See written order. Show Cause Response due by 12/26/2019. (JMB, ilcd) Modified on 1/7/2020 to show order is discharged pursuant to text order entered 1/7/20 (SKR, ilcd).
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPUY INTERNATIONAL, LTD., DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES SALES, INC., DEPUY SYNTHES, INC., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3254819.), filed by EDDIE ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Summons, #6 Exhibit Summons, #7 Exhibit Summons)(Holland, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Allen
Represented By: Eric D Holland
Represented By: Wesley Chadwick Cook
Represented By: Randall Seth Crompton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Inc
Represented By: William V Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William V Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales Inc
Represented By: William V Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy International Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Products Inc
Represented By: William V Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: William V Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?