Hines v. American Medical Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Cheryl Hines
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02035
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held 4/6/2020 before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Appearance for Plaintiff by Jeffrey Haberman. Appearance for Defendant by Shana Russo. Status conference held by telephone. Pursuant to CDIL Amended General Order 20-01, COV19-19 Public Emergency, the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/22/21 at 1:30 PM by personal appearance before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Selection/Jury Trial is set for 4/5/21 at 9:00 AM by personal appearance before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana (10 days). Each side requests a 40-hour block for trial. Trial is a No. 3 setting and counsel will be advised at the Final Pretrial Conference on 2/22/21 if Trial will proceed as scheduled. Attorney Haberman directed to complete admission process. Defense counsel reports a motion to withdraw will be filed for Attorney Barbara Binis and Attorney Shana Russo to be designated as LEAD counsel. Motions #27 , #29 , #37 are DENIED as this time, giving counsel leave to re file. Defense counsel advised that several additional motions should be pending from #47 . Court directs counsel to re file any motion that should be pending. (Court Reporter LC.) (DS, ilcd) Modified on 4/9/20 to correct Amended General Order No. (TC, ilcd).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/2/2020. On 2/21/20, the Clerk sent attorney Jeffrey L. Haberman admission paperwork. As of the date of this Order, Mr. Haberman has not yet been admitted to the Central District. The Court directs Mr. Haberman to complete the admission process on or before 4/30/20. (Miscellaneous Deadline 4/30/2020) (DS, ilcd)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/2/20. Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for 4/6/20 at 2:00 PM is RESET to 10:45 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. (Rescheduled as to time only.) (TC, ilcd)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/25/2020. On 2/21/20, the Clerk sent attorney Barbara R. Binis admission paperwork. As of the date of this Order, Ms. Binis has not yet been admitted to the Central District. The Court directs Ms. Binis to complete the admission process on or before 4/30/20.(Other Deadline set for 4/30/2020.)(DS, ilcd)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/24/2020. The Status Conference set for 3/27/20 is VACATED. This matter will be set for a status conference before the district judge. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 3/31/2020 to add docketers initials (TC, ilcd).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/24/20. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Amended General Order 20-01, In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency, the court hereby sets this matter for a Telephone Status Conference on 4/6/20 at 2:00 PM with Judge Colin S. Bruce, Urbana, IL, for the purpose of rescheduling the setting in this matter. All counsel should appear by telephone. The Court will initiate the call. (TC, ilcd)
March 19, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Shana Eve Russo on behalf of American Medical Systems Inc (Russo, Shana)
March 10, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer (Attachments: #1 Supplement ECF 231 - PTO 13, #2 Supplement ECF 288 - PTO 17, #3 Supplement ECF 292 - AMS Answer and Defense to P's First Amended SFC, #4 Supplement ECF 748 - PTO 73, #5 Supplement ECF 1234 - PTO 171, #6 Supplement ECF 6725 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Garely, Blaivas, Galloway, #7 Supplement ECF 6726 - AMS Memo ISO Daubert on Garely, Blaivas, Galloway, #8 Supplement ECF 6787 - P's Memo ISO Opp to Daubert on Garely, Blaivas, Galloway, #9 Supplement ECF 6789 - P's Memo ISO Opp to Daubert on Garely, Blaivas, Galloway re Garely, #10 Supplement ECF 6712 - AMS Brief ISO Omnibus Daubert Motion, #11 Supplement ECF 6709 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Mays, Guelcher, #12 Supplement ECF 6710 - AMS Memo ISO Daubert on Mays, Guelcher, #13 Supplement ECF 6790 - P's Opposition to Daubert re Mays, Guelcher Part 1 of 2, #14 Supplement ECF 6790 - P's Opposition to Daubert re Mays, Guelcher Part 2 of 2, #15 Supplement ECF 6868 - AMS Reply re Opposition to Daubert on Mays, Guelcher, #16 Supplement ECF 6719 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #17 Supplement ECF 6720 - Brief ISO Daubert on Rosenzweig, #18 Supplement ECF 6836 - P's Opposition re Daubert on Rosenzweig, #19 Supplement ECF 6876 - AMS Reply ISO Daubert on Rosenzweig, #20 Supplement ECF 6894 - P's Late Filed Daubert Motion to Exclude Joslin Part 1 of 4, #21 Supplement ECF 6894 - P's Late Filed Daubert Motion to Exclude Joslin Part 2 of 4, #22 Supplement ECF 6894 - P's Late Filed Daubert Motion to Exclude Joslin Part 3 of 4, #23 Supplement ECF 6894 - P's Late Filed Daubert Motion to Exclude Joslin Part 4 of 4, #24 Supplement ECF 6895 - P's Brief ISO Daubert on Joslin, #25 Supplement ECF 6933 - AMS Opposition to Daubert on Joslin Part 1 of 3, #26 Supplement ECF 6933 - AMS Opposition to Daubert on Joslin Part 2 of 3, #27 Supplement ECF 6933 - AMS Opposition to Daubert on Joslin Part 3 of 3, #28 Supplement ECF 6934 - AMS Memo ISO Opp to Daubert on Joslin, #29 Supplement ECF 6704 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Iakovlev Part 1 of 3, #30 Supplement ECF 6704 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Iakovlev Part 2 of 3, #31 Supplement ECF 6704 - AMS Daubert Motion to Exclude Iakovlev Part 3 of 3, #32 Supplement ECF 6705 - AMS Brief ISO Daubert on Iakovlev, #33 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 1 of 9, #34 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 2 of 9, #35 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 3 of 9, #36 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 4 of 9, #37 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 5 of 9, #38 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 6 of 9, #39 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 7 of 9, #40 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 8 of 9, #41 Supplement ECF 6794 - P's Response to Daubert on Iakovlev Part 9 of 9, #42 Supplement ECF 6872 - AMS Reply ISO Daubert on Iakovlev, #43 Supplement ECF 6716 - AMS Memo ISO Daubert Motion to Exclude Ostergard, #44 Supplement ECF 6788 - P's Response to Daubert on Ostergard Part 1 of 8, #45 Supplement ECF 6788 - P's Response to Daubert on Ostergard Part 2 of 8, #46 Supplement ECF 6788 - P's Response to Daubert on Ostergard Part 3 of 8, #47 Supplement ECF 6788 - P's Response to Daubert on Ostergard Part 4 of 8, #48 Supplement ECF 6788 - P's Response to Daubert on Ostergard Part 5 of 8, #49 Supplement ECF 6788 - P's Response to Daubert on Ostergard Part 6 of 8, #50 Supplement ECF 6788 - P's Response to Daubert on Ostergard Part 7 of 8, #51 Supplement ECF 6788 - P's Response to Daubert on Ostergard Part 8 of 8, #52 Supplement ECF 6867 - AMS Reply ISO Daubert on Ostergard, #53 Supplement ECF 7481 - P's Adoption of Prior Dauberts on Badylak, Becker, Kozak, Coad)(Murphy, Christopher)
February 25, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher R Murphy on behalf of American Medical Systems Inc (Murphy, Christopher)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/21/2020. A telephone status conference is set for 3/27/20 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The Court will initiate the call. (DS, ilcd)
February 20, 2020 Filing 45 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-00868. .
February 19, 2020 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02325 - American Medical Systems, Inc. (Binis, Barbara)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 2/20/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 2/19/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/06/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER directing the Clerk to replace ECF No. 37-1 (Exhibit A and Exhibit C (Parts 1 and 2) only)), in this civil action with exhibits 7559-1, 7559-2, and 7559-3 filed in AMS 2325. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
January 24, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEF by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #37 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (kew)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER directing the Clerk to file the Memoranda of Law listed herein in each individual case and link it to the appropriate Daubert motions. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
November 6, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #38 Response in Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-I) (originally filed in MDL 2325 at ECF No. 6877 on 11/01/2018) (brn)
November 6, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Certain Plaintiffs in opposition to #37 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits) (originally filed in MDL 2325 at ECF No. 6873 on 11/01/2018) (mek)
November 6, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibits F-H, #3 Exhibits I-L, #4 Exhibits M-Q, #5 Exhibits R-U, #6 Exhibit V1, #7 Exhibit V2, #8 Exhibit V3, #9 Proposed Order)(originally docketed in MDL 2325 on 10/18/2018 at ECF #6722) (mms) (Modified on 1/24/2020 to remove attachment #1 and replace with redacted version pursuant to the #42 order) (kew).
November 5, 2018 Filing 36 CROSS-NOTICE OF AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Cheryl Hines of Dr. James Kelly on November 14, 2018 at 5:30 PM CDT / 6:30 PM EDT (Haberman, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #32 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(McConnell, Stephen)
October 30, 2018 Filing 34 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of James Kelly, M.D. on November 14, 2018 at 5:30 PM (Binis, Barbara)
October 25, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Adoption of D.E. 6788 Filed in MDL 2325 by Cheryl Hines (Haberman, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Cheryl Hines in opposition to #29 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haberman, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2018 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on October 30, 2018 at 9:00 AM and October 31, 2018 at 9:00 AM. (Binis, Barbara)
October 18, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #29 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Binis, Barbara)
October 18, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - E, #2 Proposed Order)(Binis, Barbara)
October 18, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #27 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude the General Opinions and Testimony of Donald Ostergard, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703 (Binis, Barbara)
October 18, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude the General Opinions and Testimony of Donald Ostergard, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Binis, Barbara)
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on October 17, 2018 at 9:00 AM (Binis, Barbara)
October 3, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of James Kelly, M.D. on October 4, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Binis, Barbara)
July 20, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Hines for Amended Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Hines for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Hines for Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER # 255 (Amended Docket Control Order American Medical Systems Inc. Wave 3 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 249. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 3 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; AMS Wave 3 Cases) (pma)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing that the parties in the cases identified on the attached Exhibit A appear for a continuation of the Mandatory Settlement Conference on 6/15/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Charleston, West Virginia; the court expects the presence of plaintiffs, plaintiffs' counsel of record, and counsel of record for defendant American Medical Systems, Inc., at the conference. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/11/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st)
June 7, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Cheryl Hines of Roger Taylor, MD on June 27, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. CDT/10:00 a.m. EDT (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Hines for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 MOTION by Cheryl Hines to Change the Mediation Date re: #15 Pretrial Order # 253. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/25/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek)
May 24, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION by Cheryl Hines to Change the Mediation Date re: #15 Pretrial Order # 253 (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER #253 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) Directing that the settlement conferences will be conducted as follows: 1. For the cases identified on Exhibit A, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. 2. For the cases identified on Exhibit B, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. 3. For the cases identified on Exhibit C, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. Further directing that (1) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel of record as reflected on the docket sheet for that plaintiff's case; and (2) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. If the parties reach a settlement in a case listed on Exhibits A, B or C, submission of an inactive docket order for that case will relieve plaintiff and her counsel from the obligation of attending the mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibits A, B & C) (st)
May 18, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Hines for Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Roger Taylor, M.D. on May 30, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Binis, Barbara)
May 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Roger Taylor, M.D. on May 30, 2018 at 2:15 p.m. (Binis, Barbara)
May 9, 2018 Filing 11 CROSS-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION VIA VIDEOTAPE by Cheryl Hines of Cheryl Hines on May 15, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 251 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) It is ORDERED that: 1. Counsel for plaintiffs, identified on the attached Exhibit A, who have alleged claims against American Medical Systems, Inc. or Astora Women's Health, LLC and whose cases have not been resolved and are not subject to an agreement in principle to resolve, are directed to meet and confer with Reisman Karron Greene LLP, settlement counsel for AMS, on or before 5/14/2018 and to engage in good faith discussions about the possibility of settlement. Counsel may also contact Bryan Aylstock, Henry Garrard, or Fred Thompson, coordinating co-lead counsel for plaintiffs, regarding coordination of settlement discussions with AMS. 2. Counsel Reisman, Aylstock, Garrard, and Thompson are directed to provide a joint written report to the court via email on 5/18/2018 identifying which cases remaining on Exhibit A, if any, have not been resolved or dismissed. 3. In all cases that have not been resolved or dismissed by 5/18/2018, the court will conduct settlement conferences in Charleston, West Virginia at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, Room 7009 beginning at 9:00 a.m. on 6/4/2018, and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. Parties should come prepared for evening work. 4. The court will enter an order on 5/22/2018 identifying the cases wherein a settlement conference will be conducted. 5. Individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel. 6. Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. 7. Cases not settled during the settlement conference will be dealt with by further order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/19/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st)
February 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Cheryl Hines of Dr. Roger L. Taylor on 04/26/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 249 (Docket Control Order - American Medical Systems Inc. Wave 3 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 3 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any case(s) in the American Medical Systems, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 case is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 case is incorporated in the American Medical Systems, Inc., Wave 3 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 3 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 3 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; AMS Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab)
August 14, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Barbara R. Binis on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Binis, Barbara)
June 20, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Cheryl Hines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Cheryl Hines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER # 223 (Order re: Production of Case-Specific Information For Certain AMS MDL Plaintiffs) It is directed as follows: A) Existing Cases pending as of October 10, 2016. This order applies to certain cases in MDL 2325 alleging claim(s) against AMS, as of 10/10/2016, and listed on Exhibit A. B) Plaintiff Fact Sheets, Authorizations and Documents. Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A shall submit a full and complete PFS with verifications and the attached authorizations and the other documents identified herein to the individuals identified in Paragraph C by 11/21/2016, as more fully set forth herein. D) This PTO does not in any way relieve plaintiffs from their obligation to serve a Plaintiff Profile Form; and E) Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/21/2016. (cc: Clerk of JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mks)
January 28, 2016 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 204 (ORDER ESTABLISHING CRITERIA FOR APPLICATIONS TO MDL 2325 FUND TO COMPENSATE AND REIMBURSE ATTORNEYS FOR SERVICES PERFORMED AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR MDL ADMINISTRATION AND COMMON BENEFIT AND APPOINTMENT OF COMMON BENEFIT FEE AND COST COMMITTEE) entered on 01/15/2016 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (kp)
January 27, 2016 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Medical Systems, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mlh)
January 27, 2016 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4359884. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. American Medical Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Barbara R. Binis
Represented By: Shana Eve Russo
Represented By: Barbara R Binis
Represented By: Christopher R Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Hines
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Jeffrey L Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?