Walsh et al v. Bailey et al
Plaintiff: Kody Walsh and Luis Padin
Defendant: Zachary M. Sereg, Jeffrey A. Hughes, Susan K. Prentice, Chad M Brown, Rebecca Buczkowski, Dr. Kurt Osmundson, Jeremy Lorrance, Ritchie Cooper, Shane Long, Jamie Horton, Curtis Bailey, Brian A. Posey, Matthew Hubert, Nurse John Overfelt, Timothy Gross, Sheila Molinero, Joshua P Davis, Kyle Miller, John D. Wheat, Jason Dyer, Adam R Greenway, Steven M. Renner, Arthur Funk, Dustin Bayler, Kevin C. Wheeler, David A. Jenkins, Teri Kennedy, Donald Moroney, Lucas N. Nall, Nicholas M. Molinero, Kevin DeLong, Brandt Dehn, Justin M. Watson and Paul M. Thorson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02112
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
Referring Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicholas Vincent Alfonso on behalf of Rebecca Buczkowski (Alfonso, Nicholas)
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Shaun Moy on behalf of Curtis Bailey, Dustin Bayler, Chad M Brown, Rebecca Buczkowski, Ritchie Cooper, Joshua P Davis, Kevin DeLong, Brandt Dehn, Teri Kennedy, Brian A. Posey, Susan K. Prentice, Steven M. Renner, Zachary M. Sereg, Paul M. Thorson, Justin M. Watson, John D. Wheat (Moy, Joseph)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Shaun Moy on behalf of Jason Dyer, Adam R Greenway, Jamie Horton, Matthew Hubert, Jeffrey A. Hughes, David A. Jenkins, Shane Long, Jeremy Lorrance, Kyle Miller, Nicholas M. Molinero, Sheila Molinero, Donald Moroney, Lucas N. Nall, John Overfelt (Moy, Joseph)
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicholas Vincent Alfonso on behalf of Teri Kennedy (Alfonso, Nicholas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicholas Vincent Alfonso on behalf of Jeremy Lorrance, Kyle Miller, Nicholas M. Molinero, Sheila Molinero, Donald Moroney, Lucas N. Nall, John Overfelt (Alfonso, Nicholas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicholas Vincent Alfonso on behalf of Jason Dyer, Adam R Greenway, Jamie Horton, Matthew Hubert, Jeffrey A. Hughes, David A. Jenkins, Shane Long (Alfonso, Nicholas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicholas Vincent Alfonso on behalf of Dustin Bayler, Chad M Brown, Ritchie Cooper, Joshua P Davis, Kevin DeLong, Brandt Dehn, Brian A. Posey (Alfonso, Nicholas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nicholas Vincent Alfonso on behalf of Curtis Bailey, Susan K. Prentice, Steven M. Renner, Zachary M. Sereg, Paul M. Thorson, Justin M. Watson, John D. Wheat (Alfonso, Nicholas)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kurt Osmundson. Kurt Osmundson waiver sent on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Ramage, Andrew)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Anthony Daniel Schuering on behalf of Kurt Osmundson (Schuering, Anthony)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew M Ramage on behalf of Kurt Osmundson (Ramage, Andrew)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/11/2020. Case reassigned to Judge James E. Shadid and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley for all further proceedings due to nature of the case. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce, Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long no longer assigned to case (KE, ilcd) Modified on 5/11/2020 to correct typographical error (SAG, ilcd).
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet (Marsh, Jordan)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3370751.), filed by Luis Padin, Kody Walsh.(Marsh, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh et al v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary M. Sereg
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Hughes
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan K. Prentice
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad M Brown
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Buczkowski
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kurt Osmundson
Represented By: Anthony Daniel Schuering
Represented By: Andrew M Ramage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Lorrance
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritchie Cooper
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Long
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Horton
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Bailey
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian A. Posey
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hubert
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse John Overfelt
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Molinero
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua P Davis
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Miller
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Wheat
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Dyer
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam R Greenway
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Renner
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Bayler
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin C. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Jenkins
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Kennedy
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Moroney
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas N. Nall
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas M. Molinero
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin DeLong
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandt Dehn
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin M. Watson
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Thorson
Represented By: Nicholas Vincent Alfonso
Represented By: Joseph Shaun Moy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kody Walsh
Represented By: Jordan Eric Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Padin
Represented By: Jordan Eric Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?