National Trust Insurance Company v Davis et al
Plaintiff: National Trust Insurance Company
Defendant: Scot T Davis, Erica Davis, Tom Davis Electric Inc and Tom Davis Electric Inc doing business as Davis Electric
Case Number: 2:2020cv02184
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Set Deadlines: Scot T Davis answer due 8/24/2020; Erica Davis answer due 8/24/2020; Tom Davis Electric Inc answer due 8/24/2020. (JMB, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by National Trust Insurance Company as to Scot T Davis 7/9/2020. (Hackett, John)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by National Trust Insurance Company as to Erica Davis 7/9/2020. (Hackett, John)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by National Trust Insurance Company as to Tom Davis Electric Inc 7/9/2020. (Hackett, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Scot T Davis.(O'Reilly, Kevin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Scot T Davis, Erica Davis, Tom Davis Electric Inc and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB, ilcd)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against ERICA DAVIS, SCOT T. DAVIS, TOM DAVIS ELECTRIC, INC. d/b/a DAVIS ELECTRIC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3411908.), filed by NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hackett, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Trust Insurance Company v Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: John D Hackett
Represented By: Christopher Charles Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot T Davis
Represented By: Kevin E O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Davis Electric Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Davis Electric Inc doing business as Davis Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?