Smith v. County of Macon Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Kelsey Jill Smith
Defendant: Kenne Largent, Toby Walter, Jacob Warrack, RN Amanda Thompson, LPN Careth Jacoby, Community Health Improvement Center, INC. d/b/a Crossing Healthcare, MD Dana Ray, Antonio D Brown, Michael Whitsel, Macon County, IL, RN Kam Dowdy, DO Dennis Costerisan, RN Linda Fasick, Derek Flaughter, Wendy Diericks, Careth Jacoby, Amanda Thompson, Kam Dowdy, Derek Flaugher, Dana Ray, Dennis Costerisan, Community Health Improvement Center Inc doing business as Crossing Healthcare, Linda Fasick, County of Macon Illinois, Antonio Brown and Jacob Warrick
Case Number: 2:2020cv02203
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Sara Darrow
2 Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
3 Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas John Hayek on behalf of Linda Fasick (Hayek, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas John Hayek on behalf of Kam Dowdy (Hayek, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas John Hayek on behalf of Dennis Costerisan (Hayek, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas John Hayek on behalf of Dana Ray (Hayek, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas John Hayek on behalf of Community Health Improvement Center Inc (Hayek, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas John Hayek on behalf of Careth Jacoby (Hayek, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas John Hayek on behalf of Amanda Thompson (Hayek, Thomas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael B Baggett on behalf of County of Macon Illinois (Baggett, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William W Kurnik on behalf of Michael Whitsel (Kurnik, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt on behalf of Michael Whitsel (Eberhardt, Susan)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Whitsel. Michael Whitsel served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Eberhardt, Susan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William W Kurnik on behalf of Antonio Brown, County of Macon Illinois, Wendy Diericks, Derek Flaugher, Kenne Largent, Toby Walter, Jacob Warrick (Kurnik, William)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Toby Walter, Antonio Brown, Derek Flaugher, County of Macon Illinois, Wendy Diericks, Jacob Warrick, Kenne Largent. Toby Walter served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020; Antonio Brown served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020; Derek Flaugher served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020; County of Macon Illinois served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020; Wendy Diericks served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020; Jacob Warrick served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020; Kenne Largent served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Eberhardt, Susan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt on behalf of Antonio Brown, County of Macon Illinois, Wendy Diericks, Derek Flaugher, Kenne Largent, Toby Walter, Jacob Warrick (Eberhardt, Susan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Careth Jacoby. Careth Jacoby waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hayek, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amanda Thompson. Amanda Thompson waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hayek, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kam Dowdy. Kam Dowdy waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hayek, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda Fasick. Linda Fasick waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hayek, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dennis Costerisan. Dennis Costerisan waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hayek, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dana Ray. Dana Ray waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hayek, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Community Health Improvement Center Inc. Community Health Improvement Center Inc waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Hayek, Thomas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet (Schlosser, Frederick)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley for all further proceedings due to nature of the case. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce, Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long no longer assigned to case. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/17/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3425455.), filed by Kelsey Jill Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schlosser, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. County of Macon Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenne Largent
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt
Represented By: William W Kurnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Walter
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt
Represented By: William W Kurnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Warrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Amanda Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN Careth Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Improvement Center, INC. d/b/a Crossing Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Dana Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Whitsel
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt
Represented By: William W Kurnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macon County, IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Kam Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DO Dennis Costerisan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Linda Fasick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Flaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Diericks
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt
Represented By: William W Kurnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Careth Jacoby
Represented By: Thomas John Hayek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Thompson
Represented By: Thomas John Hayek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kam Dowdy
Represented By: Thomas John Hayek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Flaugher
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt
Represented By: William W Kurnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Ray
Represented By: Thomas John Hayek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Costerisan
Represented By: Thomas John Hayek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Improvement Center Inc doing business as Crossing Healthcare
Represented By: Thomas John Hayek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Fasick
Represented By: Thomas John Hayek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Macon Illinois
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt
Represented By: William W Kurnik
Represented By: Michael B Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Brown
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt
Represented By: William W Kurnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Warrick
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Eberhardt
Represented By: William W Kurnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Jill Smith
Represented By: Frederick J Schlosser
Represented By: Todd M Goebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?