CSX Transportation v. Prairie States Warehouse
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation Inc
Defendant: Prairie States Warehouse Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02230
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:10101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim CSX Transportation, Inc.'s Answer with Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaim of Defendant Prairie States Warehouse, Inc. by Plaintiff CSX Transportation Inc. (Tinnelly, Matthew)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/17/2020. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CSX Transportation Inc by Prairie States Warehouse Inc.(Beardsley, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CSX Transportation Inc re #1 Complaint service of summons and complaint upon Registered Agent Greg Allen (Tinnelly, Matthew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew John Tinnelly on behalf of CSX Transportation Inc (Tinnelly, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re #3 Summons. Mail sent to Timothy Frey. (DS, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Prairie States Warehouse Inc. (Mailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service.) (TC, ilcd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/10/2020) (TC, ilcd).
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Frey, Timothy)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prairie States Warehouse, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0753-3444006), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons)(Frey, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation v. Prairie States Warehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation Inc
Represented By: Timothy L Frey
Represented By: Matthew John Tinnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie States Warehouse Inc
Represented By: John Michael Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?