Hilliard et al v. Menard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hilliard and James Hilliard
Defendant: Menard Inc, Shurtape Technologies LLC, Natco Home Fashions, Shurtech Brands LLC, Shurtech Brands LLC Individually doing business as Duck Brand Indoor/Outdoor Carpet Tape, Multy Home LP and Shurtape Technologies LLC Individually doing business as Duck Indoor/Outdoor Carpet Tape
Case Number: 2:2020cv02239
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian P Thielen on behalf of Multy Home LP (Thielen, Brian)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/7/20. The parties' Joint Motion for Telephonic Conference #11 is GRANTED. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Amended General Order 20-01, In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency, the court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/20. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 10/19/20, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 7/19/21, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 10/19/21, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 12/19/21, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 2/18/22, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 4/19/22, discovery closes 4/19/22, case dispositive motions due 7/19/22. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/22 at 10:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 12/13/22 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 12/21/20 at 11:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The Court will initiate the call. (SKR, ilcd)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Hearing Joint Motion for Telephonic Conference by Defendant Menard Inc. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Mueller, David)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with jury demand and Affirmative Defenses to Counts I - IV of First Amended Complaint by Menard Inc.(Mueller, David)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph F Cassidy on behalf of Menard Inc (Cassidy, Joseph)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jeffrey Dale Frederick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frederick, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ivo Andrew Austin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Austin, Ivo)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David B Mueller on behalf of Menard Inc (Mueller, David)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/25/2020. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/24/2020. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #4 adequately alleges diversity jurisdiction. The Court's Order to Show Cause #3 is DISCHARGED. (DS, ilcd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Shurtape Technologies LLC, Shurtech Brands LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Schwab, Gary)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/21/2020. Show Cause Response due by 9/11/2020. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Shurtape Technologies LLC, Shurtech Brands LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwab, Gary)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Macon County, IL, case number 2020-L-35 (Filing fee $400 paid; receipt #0753-3452596), filed by defendants Shurtech Brands LLC and Shurtape Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 EX 1 First Amended Complaint, #2 EX 2 Aff of Service (Shurtape), #3 EX 3 Aff of Service (Shurtech), #4 EX 4 Consent to and Joinder in Removal (Menard Inc), #5 EX 5 Affidavit (Matthew T Raymer), #6 EX 6 Macon County Court File part 1, #7 EX 6 Macon County Court File part 2, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (KM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilliard et al v. Menard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard Inc
Represented By: Joseph F Cassidy
Represented By: David B Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shurtape Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natco Home Fashions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shurtech Brands LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shurtech Brands LLC Individually doing business as Duck Brand Indoor/Outdoor Carpet Tape
Represented By: Gary S Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multy Home LP
Represented By: Brian P Thielen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shurtape Technologies LLC Individually doing business as Duck Indoor/Outdoor Carpet Tape
Represented By: Gary S Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hilliard
Represented By: Jeffrey Dale Frederick
Represented By: Ivo Andrew Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hilliard
Represented By: Jeffrey Dale Frederick
Represented By: Ivo Andrew Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?