White v. Larson
Petitioner: Naamon L White, Sr
Respondent: People of the State of Illinois and Kim Larson
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2020cv02252
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 11/2/20, in the amount of $5.00; receipt number 24626009653. (TC, ilcd)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Judge Colin S. Bruce on 10/15/20. Petitioner's Motions for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 #3 are DENIED. Petitioner's Motion to Request Counsel #2 is DENIED. Petitioner is allowed 30 days to pay the $5 filing fee. If the filing fee is not paid within 30 days, the petition will be dismissed without prejudice. See written Order. (Other Deadline set for 11/16/20.) (TC, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Naamon L White, Sr. (TC, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Naamon L White, Sr. Responses due by 10/22/2020. (TC, ilcd)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/10/20. On 9/9/2020, Plaintiff filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . He indicates that he is incarcerated at the Danville Correctional Center, but has not submitted a trust fund ledger as required by 28 U.S.C. section 1915(a)(2). Plaintiff must submit a copy of his trust fund ledger within 30 days (trust fund ledgers due by 10/13/2020). Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. (KM, ilcd)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Naamon L White, Sr. Responses due by 9/23/2020 (JMB, ilcd)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Naamon L White, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JMB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Naamon L White, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?