Atteberry v. Wood et al
Plaintiff: John D. Atteberry
Defendant: Bryce Stratton, Ruth .., Edgar County Jail, . Wood, Brice Stratton, Jeff Wood and Ruth Bottom
Case Number: 2:2020cv02253
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John D. Atteberry. Ruth Bottom waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (RES, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John D. Atteberry. Jeff Wood waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (RES, ilcd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John D. Atteberry. Brice Stratton waiver sent on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (RES, ilcd)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Terence J Corrigan on behalf of Ruth.., Bryce Stratton,. Wood (Corrigan, Terence)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bhairav Radia on behalf of Ruth.., Bryce Stratton,. Wood (Radia, Bhairav)
October 20, 2020 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 10/20/2020, in the amount of $ 12.08; receipt number 14626038839 (AEM, ilcd)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to. Wood, Bryce Stratton, Ruth.. on 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 waiver 2, #2 waiver 3)(SAG, ilcd)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/6/2020. (SAG, ilcd)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/6/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states a Fourteenth Amendment claim for failure to provide adequate medical care against Defendants Wood, Stratton, and Ruth. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00904.
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 9/10/2020. Plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted #2 . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b) (1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $12.08. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. Plaintiff is ultimately responsible for ensuring that the initial partial filing fee and required monthly payments are made. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff.(SAG, ilcd)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Secs. 1391(b) and 1404(a) and on the Court's own motion, this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS for such further proceedings as that Court may deem appropriate, including a decision on the pending #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/9/2020. (jsy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 09/08/2020. Consent due by 9/29/2020. (jsm2)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 20-cv-904-JPG. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/8/2020. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John D. Atteberry. (jsm2) Modified on 9/10/2020 to reopen motion (SAG, ilcd).
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John D. Atteberry.(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atteberry v. Wood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth ..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brice Stratton
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wood
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Bottom
Represented By: Terence J Corrigan
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Atteberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?