Root v. United Holdings Group I LLC et al
Plaintiff: Francis Root
Defendant: United Holdings Group I LLC, Spire Recovery Solutions LLC, UHG I LLC and United Holding Group I LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02306
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/28/2020. Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #14 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to the dismissal motion #12 is now due January 13, 2021. (DS, ilcd)
December 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM -- UNOPPOSED by Plaintiff Francis Root. Responses due by 1/6/2021 (Philipps, David)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant UHG I LLC. (Little, Brendan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant UHG I LLC. Responses due by 12/30/2020 (Little, Brendan)
December 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Spire Recovery Solutions LLC answer due 11/26/2020; UHG I LLC answer due 12/16/2020 pursuant to the filing of #10 and #11 . (JMB, ilcd)
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francis Root. Spire Recovery Solutions LLC served on 11/5/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Philipps, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Francis Root as to UHG I LLC 11/25/2020; United Holdings Group I LLC 11/25/2020. (Philipps, David)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 Alias Summons Issued as to UHG I LLC and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB, ilcd)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Spire Recovery Solutions LLC, UHG I, LLC, a/k/a United Holding Group I, LLC, filed by Francis Root. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Alias Summons UHG)(Philipps, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Spire Recovery Solutions LLC, United Holdings Group I LLC and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Francis Root. (Philipps, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 Designation of Lead Counsel by David J Philipps on behalf of Francis Root. (Philipps, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Angie K Robertson on behalf of Francis Root (Robertson, Angie)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mary E Philipps on behalf of Francis Root (Philipps, Mary)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David J Philipps on behalf of Francis Root (Philipps, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spire Recovery Solutions, LLC, United Holdings Group I, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3511323.), filed by Francis Root. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons UHG, #11 Proposed Summons SRS)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Root v. United Holdings Group I LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Holdings Group I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spire Recovery Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHG I LLC
Represented By: Brendan Hoffman Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Holding Group I LLC
Represented By: Brendan Hoffman Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Root
Represented By: Mary E Philipps
Represented By: Angie K Robertson
Represented By: David J Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?