Flowers v. Midland Credit Management Inc
Plaintiff: Adrian Flowers
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02326
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/22/2020. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/22/2020. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #8 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/19/21. (JMB, ilcd)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Weller, Jennifer)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jennifer Wigington Weller on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc (Weller, Jennifer)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David M Schultz on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc (Schultz, David)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrian Flowers. Midland Credit Management Inc served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Badwan, Mohammed)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management Inc and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB, ilcd)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Victor Thomas Metroff on behalf of Adrian Flowers (Metroff, Victor)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mohammed Omar Badwan on behalf of Adrian Flowers (Badwan, Mohammed)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3526553.), filed by Adrian Flowers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Badwan, Mohammed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Midland Credit Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Flowers
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Victor Thomas Metroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Wigington Weller
Represented By: David M Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?