Lewis v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: Keyvell Lewis
Defendant: Dennis Gardner, Vermilion County Illinois, Stephane Weber, Jacqueline Lacy, Dan Taylor, President of Vermilion County or Current Head of Vermilion County, David Salazar, J B Pritzker, State of Illinois and Nancy Fahey
Case Number: 2:2021cv02008
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 3/11/2021. On 2/9/21, the Court denied Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis, noting that he had $5,411.52 in his trust fund account. Plaintiff was given 21 days in which to pay the full $402 filing fee or risk the dismissal of his case. That time has come and gone, and Plaintiff has not paid. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee.(SAG)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Keyvell Lewis (SAG, ilcd)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Keyvell Lewis.(SAG, ilcd)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 2/9/2021. Plaintiff files #7 , a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, asserting that he has no cash or money in a checking or savings account. Plaintiff discloses that he gets gift income, without providing any particulars. A review of Plaintiff's trust fund ledgers, however, reveals that he currently has $5411.52 in his account. Plaintiff's #7 is DENIED. Plaintiff is to pay the full $402 filing fee within 21 days or risk dismissal of this case.(SAG, ilcd)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint (Signed) by Plaintiff Keyvell Lewis. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (VH, ilcd)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 Remark: Plaintiff's Complaint attached pursuant to Text Order entered 1/20/2021 (SAG, ilcd)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 1/20/2021. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $402 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $402 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG, ilcd)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 1/20/2021. Plaintiff has filed a complaint which is unsigned. The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 11(a) require that all pleadings and written motions be signed personally if an individual is not represented, and otherwise signed by the attorneys of record. See also, CDIL-LR 16.3(A)(2), the original complaint must be signed by the plaintiff. The Clerk is to return the complaint to Plaintiff so that he might sign and return it. If he does not do so within 21 days, this case will be closed. All others matters are RESERVED, pending Plaintiffs filing of a signed complaint. (SAG, ilcd)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION (filed in letter form) by Plaintiff Keyvell Lewis. Responses due by 1/29/2021 (SAG, ilcd)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Keyvell Lewis.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermilion County Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President of Vermilion County or Current Head of Vermilion County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J B Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyvell Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?