FrenchPorte LLC et al v. CHI Overhead Doors Inc
Plaintiff: FrenchPorte LLC and FrenchPorte IP LLC
Defendant: CHI Overhead Doors Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv02014
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Urbana Office
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/22/2021. See written order. (JMB)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/22/2021. The Joint Motion for Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information #27 is GRANTED. The Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #28 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended to 3/26/21. (JMB)
March 19, 2021 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #22 Amended Complaint,, Joint Motion for Extension to Answer by Defendant CHI Overhead Doors Inc. Responses due by 4/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutri, Gianni)
March 19, 2021 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Order Joint Motion re [Proposed] Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Defendant CHI Overhead Doors Inc. Responses due by 4/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutri, Gianni)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/12/2021. (BMG)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/12/2021. The Joint Motion for Protective Order #24 is GRANTED. The Joint Motion for Extension to File Proposed ESI Protocol #25 is GRANTED. The deadline for the parties to submit a proposed ESI protocol is extended to 3/19/21.(BMG)
March 11, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed ESI Protocol by Defendant CHI Overhead Doors Inc. Responses due by 3/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutri, Gianni)
March 11, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant CHI Overhead Doors Inc. Responses due by 3/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutri, Gianni)
February 26, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Compliance (Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures). (Cutri, Gianni)
February 26, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FrenchPorte LLC, FrenchPorte IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Affidavit Hormann Declaration)(Mason, Geoffrey)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/23/2021. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Amended General Order 20-01, In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency, the court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #20 . Initial disclosures due 2/26/21. All other deadlines are as set in the parties' proposed plan. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 5/10/21 at 10:30 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 571-353-2300, then enter 068715238#. If the prior conference has not finished, please mute your line while you wait for your case to be called. (DS)
February 22, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by FrenchPorte IP LLC, FrenchPorte LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mason, Geoffrey)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/3/21. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 3/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (KM, ilcd)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/3/21. The Motion to Withdraw #18 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to terminate attorney James P. Ulwick from this case. (TC, ilcd)
February 2, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Counsel (James P. Ulwick) by Defendant CHI Overhead Doors Inc. Responses due by 2/16/2021 (Cutri, Gianni)
January 25, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:20-cv-00467. .
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #12 Motion for Discovery; directing the Court to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/25/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/25/2021. (c/m 1/25/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Discovery Relating to Venue filed by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC.(Mason, Geoffrey)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Discovery Relating to Venue filed by C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc..(Ulwick, James)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery Relating to Venue by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Mason, Geoffrey)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ulwick, James)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6)(Mason, Geoffrey)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration of Gianni Cutri)(Ulwick, James)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Mason, Geoffrey)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #5 Notice (Other) filed by FrenchPorte, LLC, FrenchPorte IP, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Wrong event used. Please file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC 103.3 Disclosure (Mason, Geoffrey)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC AO 120 Notice (Mason, Geoffrey) Modified on 3/6/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC re #1 Complaint,, Proposed Summons (Mason, Geoffrey)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by FrenchPorte, LLC, FrenchPorte IP, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2020 Deficiency Notice: FrenchPorte, LLC and FrenchPorte IP, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/5/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2020 Deficiency Notice FrenchPorte, LLC and FrenchPorte IP, LLC -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 3/5/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against CHI Overhead Doors against FrenchPorte, LLC, FrenchPorte IP, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8534669.), filed by FrenchPorte, LLC, FrenchPorte IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Hormann Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Mason, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FrenchPorte LLC et al v. CHI Overhead Doors Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrenchPorte LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey Colbourne Mason
Represented By: Geoffrey C Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrenchPorte IP LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey Colbourne Mason
Represented By: Geoffrey C Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI Overhead Doors Inc
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Gianni L Cutri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?