Holmes v. Piatt County Board
Plaintiff: Michael L Holmes
Defendant: Piatt County Illinois, Randy Shumard, Dale Lattz, Renee Fruendt, Shannon Carrol, Raymond Spencer and Robert Murrell
Case Number: 2:2021cv02020
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael L Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Langacker, Ronald)
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff Michael L Holmes. Responses due by 4/1/2021 (Langacker, Ronald)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/18/2021. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #11 is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until March 29, 2021, to file his Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 . (DS)
March 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/11/2021. Initial Disclosure due by 5/11/2021. (Entry for admin. purposes only to correct dates in deadlines.) (TC)
March 14, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 2/11/2022. (Entry for admin. purposes only.) (TC)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/11/2021. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Amended General Order 20-01, In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency, the court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #9 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 5/11/21, amended pleadings due 6/11/21, joinder of parties due 7/12/21, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 7/12/21, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 9/10/21, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 11/11/21, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 1/11/22, discovery closes 2/11/22, case dispositive motions due 3/29/22. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/22 at 10:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 7/12/22 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 6/2/21 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 571-353-2300, then enter 068715238#. If the prior conference has not finished, please mute your line while you wait for your case to be called. (DS)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Piatt County Illinois. (Smith, Brian)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Michael L Holmes. Responses due by 3/18/2021 (Langacker, Ronald)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin S. Bruce on 3/4/2021. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #8 is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until March 22, 2021, to file his Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 . (BMG)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/23/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 3/29/2021 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Katherine H Anderson on behalf of Piatt County Illinois (Anderson, Katherine)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to 12(B)(6) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Defendant Piatt County Illinois. Responses due by 3/8/2021 (Smith, Brian)
February 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian Michael Smith on behalf of Piatt County Illinois (Smith, Brian)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Piatt County Board and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Michael L. Holmes. (Langacker, Ronald)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Piatt County Board ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3580156.), filed by Michael L. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langacker, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Piatt County Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piatt County Illinois
Represented By: Katherine H Anderson
Represented By: Brian Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Shumard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Lattz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Fruendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Carrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L Holmes
Represented By: Ronald S Langacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?