Meeks v. Heuerman et al
Plaintiff: Brandon J Meeks
Defendant: Brad Passalacqua, Jacob Paul, Dustin Heuerman, Jody Wolker, Kyle Patterson, Stanley Harper, Steve Summers, Erin Esery and Diane Michaels
Case Number: 2:2021cv02110
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 7/19/2021, in the amount of $51.00; receipt number 14626041177 (VH)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/9/2021 granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $82.28. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. Plaintiff is ultimately responsible for ensuring that the initial partial filing fee and required monthly payments are made. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. (Prisoner Prepayment due by 7/9/2021. (KB)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Brandon J Meeks (RES)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Brandon J Meeks (Attachments: #1 envelope) (RES)
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk's Office to Trust Fund Department at Stateville Correctional Center requesting trust fund ledgers. (KB)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Brandon J Meeks. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KB)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Brandon J Meeks (KB) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/26/2021 with trust fund ledgers only) (KB).
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Brandon J Meeks.(KB)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 322 16th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KB)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Brandon J Meeks. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(KB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeks v. Heuerman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Passalacqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Heuerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Wolker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Esery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?