Brown v. Pankow et al
Plaintiff: Stan Brown
Defendant: Colby G. Wright, City of Urbana Illinois, Bryan Fink, Jonathan Yeagle, Corey Pankow and Colby G Wright
Case Number: 2:2021cv02114
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Stan Brown. (Nathan, Shneur)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/8/2021. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Amended General Order 20-01, In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency, the court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #14 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 8/13/21, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 9/10/21, fact discovery closes 2/18/22, Plaintiffs deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 3/14/22, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 5/16/22, Defendants deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 6/17/22, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 8/17/22, rebuttal opinions or supplementation pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(E) due by 9/16/22, discovery closes 11/11/22, case dispositive motions due 12/12/22. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/23 at 10:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 4/18/23 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 2/14/22 at 10:15 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 571-353-2300, then enter 068715238#. If the prior conference has not finished, please mute your line while you wait for your case to be called. (JMB)
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint by Defendants City of Urbana Illinois, Bryan Fink, Corey Pankow, Colby G Wright, Jonathan Yeagle. Responses due by 7/21/2021 (Fruehling, Keith)
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by City of Urbana Illinois, Bryan Fink, Corey Pankow, Colby G Wright, Jonathan Yeagle. (Fruehling, Keith)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2021 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/2021. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #12 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/7/21. (JMB)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants City of Urbana Illinois, Bryan Fink, Corey Pankow, Colby G Wright, Jonathan Yeagle. Responses due by 7/7/2021 (Fruehling, Keith)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bryan Jeffrey Vayr on behalf of City of Urbana Illinois, Bryan Fink, Corey Pankow, Colby G Wright, Jonathan Yeagle (Vayr, Bryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Keith Eric Fruehling on behalf of City of Urbana Illinois, Bryan Fink, Corey Pankow, Colby G Wright, Jonathan Yeagle (Fruehling, Keith)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stan Brown. Jonathan Yeagle served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Mc Carter, Matthew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stan Brown. Corey Pankow served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Mc Carter, Matthew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stan Brown. Colby G Wright served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Mc Carter, Matthew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stan Brown. City of Urbana Illinois served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Mc Carter, Matthew)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stan Brown. Bryan Fink served on 6/2/2021, answer due 6/23/2021. (Mc Carter, Matthew)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Urbana Illinois, Bryan Fink, Corey Pankow, Colby G. Wright, Jonathan Yeagle and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew James Mc Carter on behalf of Stan Brown (Mc Carter, Matthew)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Avi Tzvi Kamionski on behalf of Stan Brown (Kamionski, Avi)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3674735.), filed by Stan Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nathan, Shneur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Pankow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby G. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Urbana Illinois
Represented By: Keith Eric Fruehling
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Vayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Fink
Represented By: Keith Eric Fruehling
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Vayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Yeagle
Represented By: Keith Eric Fruehling
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Vayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Pankow
Represented By: Keith Eric Fruehling
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Vayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby G Wright
Represented By: Keith Eric Fruehling
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Vayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Brown
Represented By: Matthew James Mc Carter
Represented By: Avi Tzvi Kamionski
Represented By: Shneur Zalman Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?