Lane v. Ishrak et al
Plaintiff: Dustin M Lane
Defendant: Martha Geoff and Omar Ishrak
Case Number: 2:2021cv02126
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION In-Person Status Conference by Defendants Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak. Responses due by 10/27/2021 (Thies, John)
August 13, 2021 Filing 16 Statement from Dustin Lane to Court. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service) (BMG)
August 13, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Dustin M Lane. (BMG)
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendants Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Pratt, Bryan)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendants Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak. Responses due by 8/9/2021 (Pratt, Bryan)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/23/2021. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #2 , Motion to Strike Joint Motion to Dismiss #9 and Motion to Strike Joint Motion to Dismiss #11 are DENIED. Plaintiff must file a response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss by 8/13/21. Once the Court rules on the pending Joint Motion to Dismiss, the Court will set a scheduling order providing a deadline for the production of documents. (Responses due by 8/13/2021)(DS)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Strike #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak. (Thies, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Dustin M Lane. Responses due by 7/27/2021. (DS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bryan T Pratt on behalf of Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak (Pratt, Bryan)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Dustin M Lane. Responses due by 7/16/2021 (JMB)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered re #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (JMB)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak. (Thies, John)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak. Responses due by 7/14/2021 (Thies, John)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak. (Thies, John)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John E Thies on behalf of Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak (Thies, John)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak. Originals mailed to Plaintiff for service. (BMG)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Dustin M Lane. Responses due by 6/17/21. (TC)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martha Geoff, Omar Ishrak (Filing fee $ 402; Receipt No. 24626010064), filed by Dustin M Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Envelope, #9 USM Forms) (TC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Ishrak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Geoff
Represented By: Bryan T Pratt
Represented By: John E Thies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Ishrak
Represented By: Bryan T Pratt
Represented By: John E Thies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin M Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?