Watchfire Signs LLC v. Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC et al
Plaintiff: Watchfire Signs LLC
Defendant: Thaddeus J Bartkowski, III, Catalyst Outdoor Advertising, LLC, Tim Earle, Street Rd Outdoor, LLC, Street Rd Land Holdings, LLC, John Grabowski, Patrick Wolfington, Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC, Street Rd Outdoor LLC and Street Rd Land Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02128
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Compliance - Rule 26(a)(1). (Mercier, Sheri)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 Remark: Consent to Magistrate form to counsel pursuant to text order 7/22/2021. (BMG)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/22/2021. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Amended General Order 20-01, In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency, the court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #13 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 7/21/21, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 10/29/21, Plaintiffs deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 1/28/22, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 1/11/22, Defendants deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 3/4/22, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 4/1/22, discovery closes 4/29/22, case dispositive motions due 6/3/22. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/22 at 10:30 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 12/13/22 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Courts consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 12/13/21 at 10:30 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 571-353-2300, then enter 068715238#. If the prior conference has not finished, please mute your line while you wait for your case to be called. (BMG)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Compliance - Rule 26(a)(1). (Brennan, Claire)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Watchfire Signs LLC. (Brennan, Claire)
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Tim Earle, John Grabowski, Street Rd Land Holdings LLC, Street Rd Outdoor LLC, Patrick Wolfington. Responses due by 8/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Mercier, Sheri)
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sheri Angelina Mercier on behalf of Thaddeus J Bartkowski, III, Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC, Tim Earle, John Grabowski, Street Rd Land Holdings LLC, Street Rd Outdoor LLC, Patrick Wolfington (Mercier, Sheri)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/2021. This matter is scheduled for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by personal appearance before U.S. Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on July 28, 2021 at 9:30 AM, Courtroom B, Urbana, Illinois. See written Order.(BMG)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/28/2021. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #5 is GRANTED. Defendants Street Rd Outdoor LLC, Street Rd Land Holdings, LLC, Patrick Wolfington, John Grabowski, and Tim Earle's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/20/21.(BMG)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Plaintiff Watchfire Signs, LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brennan, Claire)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Claire Brennan on behalf of Watchfire Signs LLC (Brennan, Claire)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Watchfire Signs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Brennan, Claire)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Defendants Tim Earle, John Grabowski, Street Rd Land Holdings LLC, Street Rd Outdoor LLC, Patrick Wolfington. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Rohan, Sean)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sean Gifford Rohan on behalf of Thaddeus J Bartkowski, III, Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC, Tim Earle, John Grabowski, Street Rd Land Holdings LLC, Street Rd Outdoor LLC, Patrick Wolfington (Rohan, Sean)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC. (Schmidt, James)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC. Responses due by 6/25/2021 (Schmidt, James)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC. (Schmidt, James)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vermilion County, case number 2021-L-000018 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3681799), filed by Catalyst Outdoor Advertising, LLC, Thaddeus J Bartkowski, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint - Court filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmidt, James) Modified on 6/7/2021 (BMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watchfire Signs LLC v. Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thaddeus J Bartkowski, III
Represented By: James J. Schmidt
Represented By: Sean Gifford Rohan
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalyst Outdoor Advertising, LLC
Represented By: James J. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Earle
Represented By: Sean Gifford Rohan
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Street Rd Outdoor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Street Rd Land Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Grabowski
Represented By: Sean Gifford Rohan
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Wolfington
Represented By: Sean Gifford Rohan
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalyst Outdoor Advertising LLC
Represented By: Sean Gifford Rohan
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Mercier
Represented By: James J. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Street Rd Outdoor LLC
Represented By: Sean Gifford Rohan
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Street Rd Land Holdings LLC
Represented By: Sean Gifford Rohan
Represented By: Sheri Angelina Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watchfire Signs LLC
Represented By: Claire Brennan
Represented By: Ryan McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?