Acadia Insurance Company v. Van Buskirk
Petitioner: Acadia Insurance Company
Respondent: Ava Van Buskirk
Case Number: 2:2021cv02174
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service. (Rice, Dana)
August 30, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Ava Van Buskirk. (Duco, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Ava Van Buskirk. (Duco, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service - Rule 26 Disclosure. (Duco, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Service for filing of Defendants' Answer to Complaint. (Duco, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 26 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Ava Van Buskirk.(Duco, Matthew)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/2/2021. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #24 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 8/31/21, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 9/30/21, Plaintiffs deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 12/17/21, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 12/31/21, Defendants deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 1/17/22, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 1/31/22, discovery closes 5/13/22, case dispositive motions due 6/13/22. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/23 at 10:30 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 1/24/23 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Courts consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 1/24/22 at 10:15 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 571-353-2300, then enter 068715238#. If the prior conference has not finished, please mute your line while you wait for your case to be called. (JMB)
July 30, 2021 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Acadia Insurance Company. (Rice, Dana)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/8/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB)
July 7, 2021 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-05135.
July 6, 2021 Filing 21 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (lma, )
June 21, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (lma, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Transfer Venue, Stay, and/or Compel Arbitration #14 and transfers the case to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois as agreed to by the parties. The Court reserves resolution of Defendant's Motion with respect to Count IV for the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 30, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY by Ava Van Buskirk to response in opposition to motion #18 , MOTION by Defendant Ava Van Buskirk to dismiss , Transfer Venue, Stay, and/or Compel Arbitration #14 (Duco, Matthew)
March 16, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Acadia Insurance Companyin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Ava Van Buskirk to dismiss , Transfer Venue, Stay, and/or Compel Arbitration #14 (Rice, Dana)
February 16, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone conference held on 2/16/2021. Briefing schedule on motion to dismiss: Plaintiff's response is due by 3/16/2021; Defendant's reply is due by 3/30/2021. Discovery stayed pending ruling on motion to dismiss. Next status date set for 6/22/2021 at 9:30 a.m. for ruling on motion to dismiss. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 16 STATUS Report [Revised] by Acadia Insurance Company (Joffe, Adam)
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ava Van Buskirk by James Spiros JDS EOA.Acadia v Van Buskirk (Spiros, James)
February 12, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Ava Van Buskirk to dismiss , Transfer Venue, Stay, and/or Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Duco, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ava Van Buskirk by Matthew Joseph Duco (Duco, Matthew)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: In light of the parties' continued settlement discussions, the Court strikes the status date set for 1/12/2021 and resets it to 2/16/2021 at 9:30 a.m. If the parties have not come to a resolution by that date, the Court orders defense counsel to file an appearance by 2/12/2021 and the parties to file revised status report by 2/12/2021 complete with a proposed discovery schedule and date for Defendant's responsive pleading. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS Report [Revised] by Acadia Insurance Company (Rice, Dana)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court strikes the status date set for 12/9/2020 and resets it to 1/12/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties should file a revised status report by 1/5/2021. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report [Revised] by Acadia Insurance Company (Joffe, Adam)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Based on the parties' settlement discussions, the Court strikes the status date set for 11/6/2020 and resets it to 12/9/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The parties should file a revised status report by 12/2/2020. If the parties file a stipulation of dismissal prior to the next status date, no appearance is required. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Acadia Insurance Company (Joffe, Adam)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 11/6/2020 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 10/28/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Acadia Insurance Company by Adam Philip Joffe (Joffe, Adam)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Acadia Insurance Company by Dana A Rice (Rice, Dana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Acadia Insurance Company (Rice, Dana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Acadia Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17382839. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rice, Dana)
September 1, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice (ph, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acadia Insurance Company v. Van Buskirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Acadia Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana A Rice
Represented By: Adam P Joffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ava Van Buskirk
Represented By: James Spiros
Represented By: Matthew J Duco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?