Wolfe et al v. Coles County States Attorneys Office et al
Plaintiff: Mervin Wolfe, Taylor Schoeneman and Anthony Golding
Defendant: Coles County State's Attorney's Office, Coles County Illinois Board, Illinois Office of the State's Attorney's Appellate Prosecutor, Coles County States Attorneys Office and Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office
Case Number: 2:2021cv02206
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office. Responses due by 10/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Bracey, Joseph)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/1/2021. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #14 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 11/2/21, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 11/16/21, Plaintiffs deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 1/10/22, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 2/1/22, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 3/1/22, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 4/1/22, discovery closes 4/1/22, case dispositive motions due 5/2/22. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/22 at 1:30 PM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 10/11/22 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 4/6/22 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 571-353-2300, then enter 068715238#. If the prior conference has not finished, please mute your line while you wait for your case to be called. (DS)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Coles County Illinois Board, Coles County States Attorneys Office. (Smith, Brian)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/29/2021. Defendan's Second Motion for Extension of Time #13 is GRANTED. Defendant Illinois State Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 10/1/21. (DS)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Bracey, Joseph)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Defendants Coles County Illinois Board, Coles County States Attorneys Office. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Smith, Brian)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/8/21. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #11 is GRANTED. Defendant Illinois Office of State's Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 9/28/21. (TC)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office. Responses due by 9/21/2021 (Bracey, Joseph)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/1/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/7/2021 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/1/2021. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #9 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 9/28/21. (DS)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Coles County Illinois Board, Coles County States Attorneys Office. Responses due by 9/14/2021 (Smith, Brian)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bryan Jeffrey Vayr on behalf of Coles County Illinois Board, Coles County States Attorneys Office (Vayr, Bryan)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian Michael Smith on behalf of Coles County Illinois Board, Coles County States Attorneys Office (Smith, Brian)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr on behalf of Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office (Bracey, Joseph)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mervin Wolfe. Coles County States Attorneys Office served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Reardon, Todd)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mervin Wolfe. Coles County Illinois Board served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Reardon, Todd)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mervin Wolfe. Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Reardon, Todd)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Coles County Illinois Board, Coles County States Attorneys Office, Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office. Originals returned to Plaintiff in person at the Clerk's Office. (BMG)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Coles County Illinois Board, Coles County States Attorneys Office, Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office (Filing fee $402; receipt number 34626012643.), filed by Mervin Wolfe, Taylor Schoeneman, and Anthony Golding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Memorandum in Support)(TC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe et al v. Coles County States Attorneys Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mervin Wolfe
Represented By: Todd M Reardon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Schoeneman
Represented By: Todd M Reardon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Golding
Represented By: Todd M Reardon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coles County State's Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coles County Illinois Board
Represented By: Brian Michael Smith
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Vayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Office of the State's Attorney's Appellate Prosecutor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coles County States Attorneys Office
Represented By: Brian Michael Smith
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Vayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois States Attorneys Appellate Prosecutors Office
Represented By: Joseph Dennis Bracey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?