Craighead v. Hagen et al
Plaintiff: Jerrie Craighead, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of Jason Fancher, deceased and Jerrie Craighead
Defendant: Derek Hagen, Iroquois County, Jessie Kochenberger, Joseph Jaskula, Mark Garfield, Ronnie Harris, Claudio Garcia, Matthew Pulley, Steven Eckersley, Zachary Whitson and Iroquois County, Illinois
Case Number: 2:2021cv02223
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Jonathan E Hawley
2 Judge: Eric I Long
3 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James Louis Bizzieri on behalf of Jerrie Craighead (Bizzieri, James)
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sara J Schroeder on behalf of Steven Eckersley, Claudio Garcia, Mark Garfield, Derek Hagen, Ronnie Harris, Iroquois County, Illinois, Joseph Jaskula, Jessie Kochenberger, Matthew Pulley, Zachary Whitson (Schroeder, Sara)
October 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa Marie Meador on behalf of Matthew Pulley, Zachary Whitson (Meador, Lisa)
October 4, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James G Sotos on behalf of Matthew Pulley, Zachary Whitson (Sotos, James)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa Marie Meador on behalf of Steven Eckersley, Claudio Garcia, Mark Garfield, Ronnie Harris, Joseph Jaskula, Jessie Kochenberger (Meador, Lisa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James G Sotos on behalf of Steven Eckersley, Claudio Garcia, Mark Garfield, Ronnie Harris, Joseph Jaskula, Jessie Kochenberger (Sotos, James)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa Marie Meador on behalf of Derek Hagen, Iroquois County, Illinois (Meador, Lisa)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James G Sotos on behalf of Derek Hagen, Iroquois County, Illinois (Sotos, James)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James E. Shadid and Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley for all further proceedings due to the nature of the case. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce, Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long no longer assigned to case. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/23/2021. (SAG)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Zachary Whitson on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Steven Eckersley on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Matthew Pulley on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Claudio Garcia on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Ronnie Harris on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Mark Garfield on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Joseph Jaskula on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Jessie Kochenberger on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Iroquois County on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Sheriff Derek Hagen on 08/21/2021. (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Louis J Meyer on behalf of Jerrie Craighead, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of Jason Fancher, deceased (Meyer, Louis)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3739708.), filed by Jerrie Craighead, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of Jason Fancher, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Meyer, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craighead v. Hagen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrie Craighead, as Independent Administrator of the Estate of Jason Fancher, deceased
Represented By: Louis J Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrie Craighead
Represented By: James Louis Bizzieri
Represented By: Louis J Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Hagen
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iroquois County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Kochenberger
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Jaskula
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Garfield
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Harris
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudio Garcia
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Pulley
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Eckersley
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Whitson
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iroquois County, Illinois
Represented By: James G Sotos
Represented By: Lisa Marie Meador
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?