Global Enterprise Management LLC v. Dittrich et al
Plaintiff: Global Enterprise Management, LLC and Global Enterprise Management LLC
Defendant: Roger Dittrich and Doug Geiger
Case Number: 2:2021cv02320
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher W Bohlen on behalf of Roger Dittrich, Doug Geiger (Bohlen, Christopher)
February 9, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James A Christman on behalf of Global Enterprise Management LLC (Christman, James)
February 8, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Global Enterprise Management LLC. (Haskin, Benjamin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Global Enterprise Management LLC. (Haskin, Benjamin)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin S. Bruce on 2-7-2022. The court takes Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #3 under advisement. The court will set the matter for a hearing, if necessary, following the court's resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss #11 . (BMG)
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Reply filed by Plaintiff Global Enterprise Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haskin, Benjamin)
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Global Enterprise Management LLC. (Haskin, Benjamin)
January 25, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Roger Dittrich, Doug Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Gertsch, Andrew)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Roger Dittrich, Doug Geiger. Responses due by 2/8/2022 (Gertsch, Andrew)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin S. Bruce on 1-25-2022. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead #10 is DENIED. Defendants may amend or supplement their responsive pleading as needed. (BMG)
January 24, 2022 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Roger Dittrich, Doug Geiger. Responses due by 2/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (State Court Docket))(Gertsch, Andrew)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin S. Bruce on 1-20-2022. Plaintiff has until January 28, 2022, to file its Reply to Defendants' Response #8 , if it so chooses to file a Reply.(BMG)
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Roger Dittrich, Doug Geiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Gertsch, Andrew)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendants Roger Dittrich, Doug Geiger. (Gertsch, Andrew)
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew Gertsch on behalf of Roger Dittrich, Doug Geiger (Gertsch, Andrew)
January 18, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Roger Dittrich answer due 1/25/2022; Doug Geiger answer due 1/27/2022. (BMG)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Doug Geiger on 01/06/2022, filed by Global Enterprise Management LLC. (Haskin, Benjamin)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Roger Dittrich on 01/04/2022, filed by Global Enterprise Management LLC. (Haskin, Benjamin)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Global Enterprise Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Haskin, Benjamin)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Global Enterprise Management LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2022 (Haskin, Benjamin)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Roger Dittrich, Doug Geiger. Copies returned to plaintiff for service. (BMG)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3834764.), filed by Global Enterprise Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons to Geiger, #9 Summons to Dittrich, #10 Appearance)(Haskin, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Enterprise Management LLC v. Dittrich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Enterprise Management, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin E. Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Enterprise Management LLC
Represented By: James A Christman
Represented By: Benjamin E. Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Dittrich
Represented By: Christopher W Bohlen
Represented By: Andrew Gertsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Geiger
Represented By: Christopher W Bohlen
Represented By: Andrew Gertsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?