Cisco v. Fitton et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Cisco
Defendant: Matthew Fitton, Andrew Killian, Ford County Sheriff's Office and Ford County Correctional Center
Case Number: 2:2022cv02260
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Filing 13 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Christopher Cisco. (KE)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/23/2022. Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss this case #12 is GRANTED. Accordingly, pursuant to Plaintiff's motion and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions are denied as moot, and all hearings are vacated. This case is now closed. No judgment to enter. (KB)
December 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 1/5/2023 (KE)
December 20, 2022 Filing 11 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Christopher Cisco. (KE)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/20/2022. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $14.17. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of this order. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source, including gifts. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office, and to Plaintiff. Prisoner Prepayment due by 1/19/2023. (KE)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/15/2022. Plaintiff's motion to request counsel #9 is DENIED. The Court generally will not consider recruiting counsel for a pro se plaintiff until the Court determines that he possess a claim upon which relief can be granted after the Court conducts a review of the complaint. Plaintiff may renew his motion if his claim survives that review that the Court will conduct in the near future. (KE)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/15/2022. Plaintiff's motion to add documents #7 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion is, essentially, a motion for leave to file an amended complaint by interlineation and to add exhibits to his complaint. However, the Court does not accept piecemeal amendments to pleadings. If Plaintiff desires to amend his Complaint to add a Defendant, to add a claim, to add documents, or to substitute a Defendant for a John Doe Defendant, he should file a motion seeking leave to do so in which he identifies the changes that he desires to make in his Complaint. In addition, Plaintiff should attach a complete, proposed amended complaint that, if granted leave to file, will completely replace his original Complaint and will stand on its own without reference to or reliance upon his Original Complaint. Flannery v. Recording Indus. Ass'n of Am., 354 F.3d 632, 638 n.1 (7th Cir. 2004). The proposed Amended Complaint should explain what any and all Defendants did or did not do, including the proposed new Defendant(s), and why their actions or inactions violated Plaintiff's Constitutional rights. Until he follows this process, Plaintiff's motion is denied. Plaintiff has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to file a proposed amended complaint, if that is his desire to do so. Otherwise, the Court will conduct a merit review of Plaintiff's Original Complaint when the Court's schedule permits. (KE)
December 14, 2022 Filing 10 Letter Requesting Trust Fund Ledger. Trust Fund Ledgers due by 12/28/2022. (KE)
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 12/28/2022 (KE)
December 14, 2022 Filing 8 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Christopher Cisco.(KE)
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Add Documents and Change "Prisoner" Status by Plaintiff Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 12/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Conclusory Statements, #2 Affidavit, #3 Qualifications)(KE)
December 14, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff regarding filings. (KE)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/5/2022. Plaintiff's motion for an order of protection #3 is DENIED. Plaintiff has not yet paid the required filing fee nor obtained in forma pauperis status. Until Plaintiff either pays the filing fee or obtains IFP status, the Court will not consider any motion(s) filed by him. (KE)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/29/2022. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $402 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $402 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (KE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Plaintiff to US Marshals. (KE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL MOTION UNREDACTED (KE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Order of Protection by Plaintiff Christopher Cisco. Responses due by 12/12/2022 (KE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Cisco. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisco v. Fitton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Fitton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Killian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford County Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?