Hodges v. Sanofi US Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Hodges
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02120
Filed: May 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTES for proceedings held 7/10/2023 before Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Chris Elliott. Appearance for Defendant by Chris Gramling and Matt DePaz. Rule 16 conference held. Discovery deadlines set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Deadline to submit early summary judgment motion on the issue of statute of limitations is 8/4/23; Plaintiff's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 4/1/24; Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 6/1/24; Defendant's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 7/1/24; Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 8/26/24; Plaintiff shall disclose rebuttal experts and/or reports by 9/27/24; Plaintiff shall make any such experts available for deposition by 10/25/24; Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by 11/15/24; Case dispositive motions due by 11/27/24; Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 4/14/2025 at 10:30 AM by personal appearance before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Selection/Jury Trial is scheduled for 4/29/2025 at 9:00 AM before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Status Hearing set before Judge Long on 12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM by telephone to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. Parties should dial 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574 for the call. (Tape #UR-B 9:53 AM.) (BMG)
July 7, 2023 Filing 21 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Northrip, William)
July 7, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Christopher Elliott on behalf of Joyce Hodges (Elliott, John)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/3/2023. Defendants' Motion to Withdraw #18 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to terminate attorneys Harley V. Ratliff and Christopher J. Kaufman from the case. (BMG)
June 30, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matthew Edward DePaz on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (DePaz, Matthew)
June 30, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Harley V. Ratliff and Christopher J. Kaufman by Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2023 (Northrip, William)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/29/2023. The Clerk sent Attorneys Darin Lee Schanker and Jere Kyle Bachus admission paperwork on 5/30/23. As of the date of this order, Attorneys Schanker and Bachus have not completed the admission process. Attorneys Schanker and Bachus must complete the admission process within 30 days. (BMG)
June 28, 2023 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re Order #10 sent to Law Firm of Bachus & Schanker, 1899 Wynkoop Street, Suite 700, Denver, CO 80202 stamped "Attempted Address Not Known." (TC)
June 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Adrienne L Byard on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Byard, Adrienne)
June 23, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher Paul Gramling on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Gramling, Christopher)
June 9, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tracy L Turner on behalf of Joyce Hodges (Turner, Tracy)
June 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jousef M Shkoukani on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Shkoukani, Jousef)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Northrip, William)
June 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Francis Northrip on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Northrip, William)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/26/2023. This matter is scheduled for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by personal appearance on 7/10/2023 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(BMG)
May 25, 2023 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-02632. .
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Central District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/12/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 15836)(sa)
May 24, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Case Specific) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3)(Gramling, Christopher)
May 19, 2023 Filing 6 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (General) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71, #72 72, #73 73, #74 74, #75 75, #76 76, #77 77, #78 78, #79 79, #80 80, #81 81, #82 82, #83 83, #84 84, #85 85, #86 86, #87 87, #88 88, #89 89, #90 90, #91 91, #92 92, #93 93, #94 94, #95 95, #96 96, #97 97, #98 98, #99 99, #100 100, #101 101, #102 102, #103 103, #104 104, #105 105, #106 106, #107 107, #108 108, #109 109, #110 110, #111 111, #112 112, #113 113, #114 114, #115 115, #116 116)(Britton, Mary)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI)
March 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (mm)
March 13, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
March 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6719098) filed by Joyce Hodges. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Darin Lee Schanker added to party Joyce Hodges(pty:pla).(Schanker, Darin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/14/2018) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/14/2018) (mm). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/14/2018) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. Sanofi US Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Hodges
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Tracy L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?