Palm v. Sanofi US Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carol Palm
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis US Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv02252
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lauren E Edmunds on behalf of Carol Palm (Edmunds, Lauren)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/12/2023. The court adopts the deadlines in the parties' Proposed Discovery Plan #13 . The following deadlines are set: Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 10/2/24, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 11/29/24, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 12/2/24, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 1/31/25, discovery closes 1/31/25. Sanofi may file an early motion for summary judgment following the depositions of Plaintiff and her prescribing oncologist on the issues of whether Plaintiff's claims are barred by the statute of limitations, and/or learned intermediary (assuming there are appropriate grounds to do so). Case dispositive motions on all remaining dispositive issues are due 3/3/25. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/25 at 11:15 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 7/29/25 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 5/22/24 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574.(BMG)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Carol Palm. (Black, John)
December 4, 2023 Minute entry for proceedings held on 12/4/2023 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance on behalf of plaintiff by Ben Black and Michael Lenert. Appearance on behalf of defendants by Jousef Shkoukani and William Northrip. Status hearing held by phone. Status of the case/discovery discussed. Parties to file proposed schedule by 12/11/23. (Tape #UR-B 9:48 AM.) (BMG)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Benjamin Black on behalf of Carol Palm (Black, John)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael W Lenert on behalf of Carol Palm (Lenert, Michael)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/27/2023. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Telephone Status Conference set for 11/30/23 is RESCHEDULED to 12/4/23 at 9:45 AM. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574.(BMG)
November 17, 2023 Filing 10 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (Northrip, William)
November 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Francis Northrip on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Northrip, William)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/15/2023. A telephone status conference is set for 11/30/23 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574. (BMG)
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-04597. .
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Central District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaufman, Christopher)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI)
May 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (tk)
May 3, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
May 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6840689) filed by Carol Palm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Robert J. Binstock added to party Carol Palm(pty:pla).(Binstock, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm v. Sanofi US Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US LLC
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US Inc
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Palm
Represented By: Dennis Craig Reich
Represented By: Robert J Binstock
Represented By: Lauren E Edmunds
Represented By: John Benjamin Black
Represented By: Michael W Lenert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?