Jones v. Kankakee County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Solomon A Jones
Defendant: Kankakee County Sheriff's Office, Kankakee City Police Department, City of Kankakee and County of Kankakee
Case Number: 2:2023cv02253
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 OBJECTION to Text Order Granting Extension of Time to File Answer by Solomon A Jones. (TC)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/21/2023. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(B)(1), "[u]nless the court, in its discretion, grants leave to a pro se filer to file electronically, pro se filers must file paper originals of all complaints, pleadings, motions, affidavits, briefs, and other documents." Due to complexity of e-filing, Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Become E-Filer #4 is DENIED. (JMB)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Colin S. Bruce by Plaintiff Solomon A Jones. Responses due by 1/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion) (TC)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/18/2023. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #13 is GRANTED. Kankakee County Sheriffs Office, Kankakee City Police Department, City of Kankakee and the County of Kankakee's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 1/28/24. (DS)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants City of Kankakee, County of Kankakee, Kankakee City Police Department, Kankakee County Sheriff's Office. Responses due by 12/29/2023 (Mathues, G)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by City of Kankakee, County of Kankakee, Kankakee City Police Department, Kankakee County Sheriff's Office. (Condon, Michael)
December 14, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by G David Mathues on behalf of City of Kankakee, County of Kankakee, Kankakee City Police Department, Kankakee County Sheriff's Office (Mathues, G)
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael W Condon on behalf of City of Kankakee, County of Kankakee, Kankakee City Police Department, Kankakee County Sheriff's Office (Condon, Michael)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solomon A Jones. City of Kankakee served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; County of Kankakee served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; Kankakee City Police Department served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 County of Kankakee, #2 Kankakee City Police Department)(JMB)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Colin S. Bruce by Plaintiff Solomon A Jones. Responses due by 12/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion) (TC)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Solomon A Jones. Kankakee County Sheriff's Office served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (JMB)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Kankakee, County of Kankakee, Kankakee City Police Department, Kankakee County Sheriff's Office and sent to the US Marshal for service. (JMB) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/21/2023) (JMB).
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/21/2023. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed without prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #2 which is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Service #3 is DENIED AS MOOT. It is ordered that the US Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons and order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis upon the Defendant as directed by the Plaintiff. See written order. (JMB)
November 14, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Plaintiff Solomon A Jones. Responses due by 11/28/2023. (BMG)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by Plaintiff Solomon A Jones. Responses due by 11/24/2023 (JMB)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Solomon A Jones. Responses due by 11/24/2023 (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JMB)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Solomon A Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JMB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Kankakee County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon A Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kankakee County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Michael W Condon
Represented By: G David Mathues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kankakee City Police Department
Represented By: Michael W Condon
Represented By: G David Mathues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kankakee
Represented By: Michael W Condon
Represented By: G David Mathues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kankakee
Represented By: Michael W Condon
Represented By: G David Mathues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?