Bagley et al v. Blagojevich et al
Plaintiff: Kent Rohe, John West, Ronald Gilbert, Elizabeth Thorson, Paul . Morgan, Kenneth Bishop, Joseph Compton, Eric Welch, Steven Best, Mark Mountain, Stephen Mattox, Steve Bigelow, Curtland Sawyer, Lawrence Burton, Stanley Noll, Melvin Cooper, Stephen Widger, Jim Suits, Donald Riveria, Lloyd Dejaynes, Lori Oakley, Colleen Bagley, James Brown, Tony Elder, Kevin Laskey, Richard McDonald, Doug Vinyard, Julia Lynn, Misty Valestin, Jim Luth, Jacques Beardsley, Russell Reynolds, William Rees, Anthony Harvey, Larry Roach, Tim Elliott, Michael Chapman, William Carrell, Ronald Kolweier, William Clardy, Venita Wright, Glenn Malone, Billy Groaning, Steven Ward, Kent Janssen, Andrew Schott, Stephen King, Randy Jenkins, Tim McGrew, Virgil Taylor, Rickey Williams, Frank Fairless, Jeffrey Clapp, Norma Bartman, Roger Ruppel, Calvin Landis, Joseph Cowan, Deborah Seeman, John Wheat, James Russell, Leon Kerr, Calvin Wallace, Luther Byrd, Steve Snyder, Christopher Hughes, Richard Samuelson and Jeffrey Hughes
Defendant: Roger E Walker, Jr, Henry Bayer, Justin Smock, Julie Curry, James Underwood, Buddy Maupin and Rod Blagojevich
Respondent: Edward W Huntley
Case Number: 3:2005cv03156
Filed: June 24, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
Presiding Judge: Byron G Cudmore
Referring Judge: Richard Mills
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER of U S Court of Appeals as to Bill of Costs. Costs taxed in favor of Appellee Buddy Maupin in the amount of $172.80. (MAS, ilcd)
May 24, 2011 Filing 184 MANDATE of U S Court of Appeals as to #172 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Laskey; Richard McDonald; Kent Janssen; Colleen Bagley; Calvin Wallace; Russell Reynolds; William Clardy; Roger Ruppel; Lori Oakley; Julia Lynn; Joseph Compton; Curtland Sawyer; Kent Rohe; James Brown; Anthony Harvey; Melvin Cooper; Randy Jenkins; Tim McGrew; Jim Luth; Richard Samuelson; Christopher Hughes; Steven Ward; Leon Kerr; Doug Vinyard; Calvin Landis; Ronald Kolweier; Norma Bartman; James Russell; Stephen Widger; Stanley Noll; Stephen Mattox; Jeffrey Clapp; Tony Elder; Eric Welch; Paul Morgan; Kenneth Bishop; Steve Snyder; Rickey Williams; Michael Chapman; Elizabeth Thorson; Mark Mountain; Deborah Seeman; John West; Tim Elliott; Larry Roach; Lloyd Dejaynes; William Carrell; Jacques Beardsley; Steve Bigelow; John Wheat; Joseph Cowan; Lawrence Burton; Steven Best and Stephen King. The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision of the U S Court of Appeals entered on this date. (MAS, ilcd)
July 29, 2010 Remark: U S Court of Appeals acknowledged receipt of the Long Record and Transmittal Letter (MAS, ilcd)
July 29, 2010 Filing 183 Letter of Transmittal to U S Court of Appeals re #172 Notice of Appeal (Long Record sent to U S Court of Appeals via UPS on 7/23/2010)(MAS, ilcd)
July 23, 2010 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to U S Court of Appeals consisting of 20 Volumes of Pleadings on a CD, regarding d/e #172 Notice of Appeal. Long Record mailed via UPS, tracking # 1Z6476490310051801. (MAS, ilcd)
July 20, 2010 Filing 182 Request from U S Court of Appeals for Long Record. (MAS, ilcd)
April 9, 2010 Filing 181 Remark: Appeal Record prepared and received by J Shapiro of Baker, Baker & Krajewski. Long Record contained on a CD consisting of 20 Volumes of electronic pleadings. (MAS, ilcd)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the Plaintiffs' Motion to Check Out Record on Appeal [d/e 180] is ALLOWED. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 3/30/2010. (MAS, ilcd)
March 25, 2010 Filing 180 MOTION To Check out Record on Appeal by Plaintiffs Colleen Bagley, Norma Bartman, Jacques Beardsley, Steven Best, Steve Bigelow, Kenneth Bishop, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Leon Kerr, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Jim Luth, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Mark Mountain, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, Roger Ruppel, James Russell, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Steve Snyder, Jim Suits, Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Doug Vinyard, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright. Responses due by 4/12/2010 (Baker, John)
March 2, 2010 Filing 179 OBJECTION to Defendants' Bills of Costs by Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard. (Kerley, John)
March 2, 2010 Filing 178 OBJECTION to the Bill of Costs by Colleen Bagley, Norma Bartman, Jacques Beardsley, Steven Best, Kenneth Bishop, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Joseph Cowan, Julie Curry, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Tim McGrew, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits, Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright. (Baker, John)
February 18, 2010 Filing 177 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from U S Court of Appeals regarding d/e #172 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Laskey; Richard McDonald; Kent Janssen; Colleen Bagley; Calvin Wallace; Russell Reynolds; William Clardy; Roger Ruppel; Lori Oakley; Julia Lynn; Joseph Compton; Curtland Sawyer; Kent Rohe; James Brown; Anthony Harvey; Melvin Cooper; Randy Jenkins; Tim McGrew; Jim Luth; Richard Samuelson; Christopher Hughes; Steven Ward; Leon Kerr; Doug Vinyard; Calvin Landis; Ronald Kolweier; Norma Bartman; James Russell; Stephen Widger; Stanley Noll; Stephen Mattox; Jeffrey Clapp; Tony Elder; Eric Welch; Paul Morgan; Kenneth Bishop; Steve Snyder; Rickey Williams; Michael Chapman; Elizabeth Thorson; Mark Mountain; Deborah Seeman; John West; Tim Elliott; Larry Roach; Lloyd Dejaynes; William Carrell; Jacques Beardsley; Steve Bigelow; John Wheat; Joseph Cowan; Lawrence Burton; Steven Best and Stephen King. U S Court of Appeals Case Number is 10-1389. (MAS, ilcd)
February 18, 2010 Filing 176 NOTICE Adding Glenn Malone as an Appellant re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Baker, John)
February 18, 2010 Filing 175 Short Record of Appeal Sent to U S Court of Appeals regarding d/e #172 Notice of Appeal. (MAS, ilcd)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Add an Additional Plaintiff to Notice of Appeal [d/e 174] is ALLOWED. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 2/17/2010. (MAS, ilcd)
February 16, 2010 Filing 174 MOTION Leave to Add an Additional Plaintiff to Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Glenn Malone. Responses due by 3/5/2010 (Baker, John)
February 16, 2010 Miscellaneous Deadline of 3/2/2010 set for objections to be filed to Bill of Costs filed on 2/8/2010 (d/e 169) (MAS, ilcd)
February 16, 2010 NOTICE regarding d/e #169 Bill of Costs filed on 2/8/2010 by attorney Melissa J Auerbach for defendants Buddy Maupin and Henry Bayer. Costs will be taxed in the amount of $16,190.35; parties have 10 working days (until March 2, 2010) to file objections. (MAS, ilcd)
February 16, 2010 Miscellaneous Deadline of 3/2/2010 set for objections to Bill of Costs to be filed. (MAS, ilcd)
February 16, 2010 NOTICE regarding d/e #171 Bill of Costs: Costs will be taxed in the amount of $39,793.61; parties have 10 working days (until March 2, 2010) to file objections. (MAS, ilcd)
February 12, 2010 USCA Appeal Fees received in the amount of $455.00, receipt number 34626002317 re #172 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kevin Laskey, Richard McDonald, Kent Janssen, Colleen Bagley, Calvin Wallace, Russell Reynolds, William Clardy, Roger Ruppel, Lori Oakley, Julia Lynn, Joseph Compton, Curtland Sawyer, Kent Rohe, James Brown, Anthony Harvey, Melvin Cooper, Randy Jenkins, Tim McGrew, Jim Luth, Richard Samuelson, Christopher Hughes, Steven Ward, Leon Kerr, Doug Vinyard, Calvin Landis, Ronald Kolweier, Norma Bartman, James Russell, Stephen Widger, Stanley Noll, Stephen Mattox, Jeffrey Clapp, Tony Elder, Eric Welch, Paul. Morgan, Kenneth Bishop, Steve Snyder, Rickey Williams, Michael Chapman, Elizabeth Thorson, Mark Mountain, Deborah Seeman, John West, Tim Elliott, Larry Roach, Lloyd Dejaynes, William Carrell, Jacques Beardsley, Steve Bigelow, John Wheat, Joseph Cowan, Lawrence Burton, Steven Best, Stephen King. (DM, ilcd)
February 12, 2010 Filing 173 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Colleen Bagley, Norma Bartman, Jacques Beardsley, Steven Best, Steve Bigelow, Kenneth Bishop, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Leon Kerr, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Jim Luth, Julia Lynn, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Mark Mountain, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, Russell Reynolds, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, Roger Ruppel, James Russell, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Deborah Seeman, Steve Snyder, Elizabeth Thorson, Doug Vinyard, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams re #172 Notice of Appeal,,, (Baker, John)
February 12, 2010 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Colleen Bagley, Norma Bartman, Jacques Beardsley, Steven Best, Steve Bigelow, Kenneth Bishop, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Leon Kerr, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Jim Luth, Julia Lynn, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Mark Mountain, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, Russell Reynolds, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, Roger Ruppel, James Russell, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Deborah Seeman, Steve Snyder, Elizabeth Thorson, Doug Vinyard, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams. (Baker, John)
February 12, 2010 Filing 171 BILL OF COSTS submitted on behalf of Julie Curry, Justin Smock, James Underwood, Roger E Walker, Jr re #168 Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Itemization of Costs, #2 Exhibit A: Depsition invoices, #3 Exhibit B: Subpoenas Part 1, #4 Exhibit B: Subpoenas Part 2, #5 Exhibit C: Copy invoices Part 1, #6 Exhibit C: Copy Invoices Part 2, #7 Exhibit C: Copy Invoices Part 3)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
February 9, 2010 Filing 170 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re #169 Bill of Costs by Melissa J Auerbach on behalf of Henry Bayer, Buddy Maupin (Auerbach, Melissa)
February 8, 2010 Filing 169 BILL OF COSTS submitted on behalf of Henry Bayer, Buddy Maupin re #168 Judgment. (Auerbach, Melissa)
January 15, 2010 Filing 168 JUDGMENT entered in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiffs (CC, ilcd)
January 15, 2010 Filing 167 OPINION. The AFSCME Officials' Motion for Summary Judgment [d/e 143] and the State Officials' Motion for Summary Judgment [d/e 144] are ALLOWED. Judgment shall be entered in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiffs. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 1/15/2010. (CC, ilcd)
September 15, 2009 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. (Fowler, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2009 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM in Support re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. (Auerbach, Melissa)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Exhibits (d/e 162) is ALLOWED. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 9/2/2009. (MAS, ilcd)
September 2, 2009 Filing 164 Exhibit re #161 Response to Motion,,,, by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
September 2, 2009 Filing 163 Exhibit re #161 Response to Motion,,,, by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
September 1, 2009 Filing 162 MOTION for Leave to File Attachments to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memornadum of Law in Response to Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 9/18/2009 (Baker, John)
September 1, 2009 Filing 161 RESPONSE to Motion re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the Plaintiffs' Motion for a 1-Day Extension of Time (d/e 160) is ALLOWED. The Plaintiffs' response to the Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment is due September 1, 2009. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 9/1/2009. (MAS, ilcd)
August 31, 2009 Filing 160 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 9/17/2009 (Baker, John)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time (d/e 159) is GRANTED. Confusingly, the motion asks for two different extension dates. Since this is a consent motion, this Court assumes that it was the shorter time period that was agreed to. As such, the response is now due on or before August 31, 2009. Given the age of this case, the Court will not be receptive to further extensions. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 7/31/2009. (MAS, ilcd)
July 31, 2009 Filing 159 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 8/17/2009 (Kerley, John)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Text Order of 6/3/2009 is incorrect. The Court's intention was to extend Plainitffs' response date to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment #143 #144 to 8/1/2009. (LB, ilcd)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion for Enlargement of Time to Conduct Discovery #158 reviewed and ALLOWED ONLY IN PART. Fact discovery extended to 7/1/2009 - FINAL EXTENSION; Dispositive motion deadline extended to 8/1/2009. The same limits apply on the depositions as in Text Order of 4/27/2009. (LB, ilcd)
June 2, 2009 Filing 158 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 6/19/2009 (Kerley, John)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Before the Court is Defendants' Emergency Motion to Reconsider and for a Protective Order #155 and Plaintiffs' Response #157 . The Court accepts Plaintiffs' counsel's representations and DENIES Defendants' Motion #155 . The depositions of the four individuals listed in this Court's Text Order of 3/23/2009 are allowed to proceed - a maximum of four hours per deposition - subject matter of the depositions limited to the issue(s) outlined in [154-2]. Fact discovery is extended to 6/1/2009. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment #143 #144 due 6/19/2009. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 4/27/09. (LB, ilcd)
April 22, 2009 Filing 157 RESPONSE to Motion re #155 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,, in response to defendants' objections re: motion to reconsider and for a protective order filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Baker, John)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time #156 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 4/22/2009 to respond to Motion to Reconsider #155 . (LB, ilcd)
April 17, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Reconsider and for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 5/4/2009 (Kerley, John)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs to file response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Reconsider and for a Protective Order #155 by 4/17/2009. All depositions noticed by Plaintiffs as allowed by this Court's Text Order of 3/23/2009 STAYED pending further order of Court. (LB, ilcd)
April 10, 2009 Filing 155 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 4/27/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit & Award, #2 Exhibit B: ALJ Order)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery #148 , Defendants Maupin's and Bayer's Objection #149 , State Defendants' Objection #150 , and Plaintiffs' Rule 56(f) Affidavit #154 as ordered by the Court. Based upon the Affidavit [154-2], the Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery #148 for the limited purpose of deposing Julie Curry, Alonzo Monk, Don Snyder, and Nancy Pittman. Each deposition is limited to a maximum of four hours. The subject matter of each deposition is limited to the issue(s) outlined in [154-2]. Fact discovery is extended to 4/24/2009. Plaintiffs to respond to the current motions for summary judgment #143 #144 by 5/22/2009. (LB, ilcd)
March 20, 2009 Filing 154 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #148 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Compliance with Court Order Requiring Rule 56(f) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John E. Kerley)(Kerley, John)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion for Extension of Time #153 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 3/20/2009 to file Rule 56(F) Affidavits. (LB, ilcd)
March 17, 2009 Filing 153 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 56(f) Affidavits by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 4/3/2009 (Baker, John)
March 11, 2009 Filing 152 AFFIDAVIT re Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, #147 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,, Amended Exhibt by Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Position Statement, #2 Exhibit 2: Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3: Mot to Intervene & Dismiss, #4 Exhibit 4: Arbitration Award)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion for Leave to File Corrected Attachment 3 to D/E 147 #151 ALLOWED. (LB, ilcd)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery #148 and Defendants Buddy Maupin and Henry Bayer's Objection #149 . Plaintiffs to file in strict accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f), affidavit(s) signed by counsel under oath listing with specified reasons the essential facts plaintiffs do not have to justify opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and the specific discovery requested to be conducted. Rule 56(f) affidavit(s) to be filed by 3/17/2009. (LB, ilcd)
March 9, 2009 Filing 151 MOTION to Amend/Correct #147 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,, As to Smock Affidavit by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 3/26/2009 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A: Smock Aff & Exhibits)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
March 9, 2009 Filing 150 OBJECTION to Plaintiffs' Mot for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery to #148 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. (Gagliardo, Joseph)
March 6, 2009 Filing 149 OBJECTION to #148 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. (Auerbach, Melissa)
March 6, 2009 Filing 148 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 3/23/2009 (Kerley, John)
February 27, 2009 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM in Support re #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, James Underwood, Plaintiff Steve Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Becker, #2 Affidavit Curry, #3 Affidavit Smock, #4 Affidavit Walker, #5 Exhibit Bagley dep x, #6 Exhibit bartman dep x, #7 Exhibit Bayer dep x, #8 Exhibit Beardsley dep x, #9 Exhibit Best dep x, #10 Exhibit Bigelow dep x, #11 Exhibit Bishop Dep x, #12 Exhibit Brown Dep x, #13 Exhibit Burton Dep x, #14 Exhibit Buscher dep x, #15 Exhibit byrd dep x, #16 Errata Carrell dep x, #17 Exhibit Chapman dep x, #18 Exhibit Clapp dep x, #19 Errata Clardy dep x, #20 Exhibit Compton dep x, #21 Exhibit Cooper dep x, #22 Exhibit Cowan dep x, #23 Exhibit Danner dep x, #24 Exhibit Defraties dep x, #25 Exhibit Dejaynes dep x, #26 Exhibit Elder dep x, #27 Exhibit Elliott dep x, #28 Exhibit Fairless dep x, #29 Exhibit Gilbert dep x, #30 Exhibit Glecker dep x, #31 Exhibit Groaning dep x, #32 Errata Harvey dep x, #33 Exhibit Hughes, C dep x, #34 Exhibit Hughes, J dep x, #35 Exhibit Janssen dep x, #36 Exhibit jenkins dep x, #37 Exhibit Kerr dep x, #38 Exhibit King dep x, #39 Exhibit Kolweir dep x, #40 Exhibit Landis dep x, #41 Exhibit laskey dep x, #42 Exhibit Luth dep x, #43 Exhibit Lynn dep x, #44 Exhibit Malone dep x, #45 Exhibit Mattox dep x, #46 Exhibit maupin dep x, #47 Exhibit McDonald dep x, #48 Exhibit McGrew dep x, #49 Exhibit Morgan dep x, #50 Exhibit Mountain dep x, #51 Exhibit Noll dep x, #52 Exhibit Oakley dep x, #53 Exhibit Rees Dep x, #54 Exhibit Reynolds dep x, #55 Exhibit Riviera dep x, #56 Exhibit Roach dep x, #57 Exhibit Rohe dep x, #58 Exhibit Rohlfs dep x, #59 Exhibit Ruiz dep x, #60 Exhibit Ruppell dep x, #61 Exhibit Russell dep x, #62 Exhibit Samuelson dep x, #63 Exhibit Sawyer dep x, #64 Exhibit Schott dep x, #65 Exhibit Seeman Dep x, #66 Exhibit Small dep x, #67 Exhibit Smith dep x, #68 Exhibit Smock dep x, #69 Exhibit Snyder dep x, #70 Exhibit Suits dep x, #71 Exhibit taylor dep x, #72 Exhibit Thorson dep x, #73 Exhibit Underwood dep x, #74 Errata Valestin dep x, #75 Exhibit Vinyard dep x, #76 Exhibit Wallace dep x, #77 Exhibit Ward dep x, #78 Exhibit Welch dep x, #79 Exhibit West dep x, #80 Exhibit Wheat dep x, #81 Exhibit Widger dep x, #82 Exhibit Williams dep x)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The motion to strike [d/e 146] is GRANTED. The memorandum in support [d/e 145] is hereby STRICKEN.Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 2/27/2009. (MAS, ilcd)
February 27, 2009 Filing 146 MOTION to Strike #145 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 3/16/2009 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
February 27, 2009 Filing 145 DOCUMENT STRICKEN. MEMORANDUM in Support re #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Becker, #2 Affidavit Curry, #3 Affidavit Smock, #4 Affidavit Walker, #5 Exhibit Bagley dep excerpts, #6 Exhibit Bartman dep. x, #7 Exhibit Bayer Dep x, #8 Exhibit Beardsley dep x, #9 Exhibit Best Dep x, #10 Exhibit Bigelow dep x, #11 Exhibit Bishop dep x, #12 Exhibit brown dep x, #13 Exhibit Burton Dep x, #14 Exhibit buscher dep x, #15 Exhibit Byrd dep x, #16 Exhibit Carrell dep x, #17 Exhibit Chapman dep x, #18 Exhibit Clapp dep x, #19 Exhibit Clardy dep x, #20 Exhibit Compton dep x, #21 Exhibit Cooper dep x, #22 Exhibit Cowan dep x, #23 Exhibit Dann dep x, #24 Exhibit DeFraties dep x, #25 Exhibit DeJaynes dep x, #26 Exhibit Elder dep x, #27 Exhibit Elliott dep x, #28 Exhibit fairless dep x, #29 Exhibit Gilbert dep x, #30 Exhibit Glecker dep x, #31 Exhibit Groaning dep x, #32 Exhibit harvey dep x, #33 Exhibit Hughes, C dep x, #34 Exhibit Hughes, J dep x, #35 Exhibit Janssen dep x, #36 Exhibit jenkins dep x, #37 Exhibit Kerr dep x, #38 Exhibit King dep x, #39 Exhibit Kolweir dep x, #40 Exhibit landis dep x, #41 Exhibit laskey dep x, #42 Exhibit Luth dep x, #43 Exhibit Lynn dep x, #44 Exhibit Malone dep x, #45 Exhibit mattox dep x, #46 Exhibit maupin dep x, #47 Exhibit McDonald dep x, #48 Exhibit McGrew dep x, #49 Exhibit Morgan dep x, #50 Exhibit Mountain dep x, #51 Exhibit Noll dep x, #52 Exhibit oakley dep x, #53 Exhibit Rees dep x, #54 Exhibit Reynolds dep x, #55 Exhibit Riviera dep x, #56 Exhibit Roach dep x, #57 Exhibit Rohe dep x, #58 Exhibit Rohlfs dep x, #59 Exhibit Ruiz dep x, #60 Exhibit Ruppel dep x, #61 Exhibit Russell dep x, #62 Exhibit Samuelson dep x, #63 Exhibit Sawyer dep x, #64 Exhibit Schott dep x, #65 Exhibit Seeman dep x, #66 Exhibit Small dep x, #67 Exhibit Smith dep x, #68 Exhibit Smock dep x, #69 Exhibit Snyder dep x, #70 Exhibit Suits dep x, #71 Exhibit taylor dep x, #72 Exhibit Thorson dep x, #73 Exhibit Underwood dep x, #74 Exhibit valestin dep x, #75 Exhibit Vinyard dep x, #76 Exhibit Wallace dep x, #77 Exhibit Ward dep x, #78 Exhibit Welch dep x, #79 Exhibit West dep x, #80 Exhibit Wheat dep x, #81 Exhibit Widger dep x, #82 Exhibit Williams dep x)(Gagliardo, Joseph) Modified on 2/27/2009 to reflect that this document is STRICKEN. (MAS, ilcd).
February 27, 2009 Filing 144 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 3/23/2009 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion to Withdraw Appearance #142 ALLOWED. Attorney Carrie Alice Herschman terminated as counsel for Defendants Maupin and Bayer. (LB, ilcd)
February 26, 2009 Filing 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Responses due by 3/23/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part I, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part II, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 Part III, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 Part I, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 Part II, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 Part III, #8 Exhibit Exhibits A-3 through A-6, #9 Exhibit Exhibits A-7 through A-9, #10 Exhibit Exhibits B and B-1 through B-4, #11 Exhibit Exhibits C and C-1 through C-4, #12 Exhibit Exhibits D through G)(Auerbach, Melissa)
February 26, 2009 Filing 142 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Carrie A. Herschman by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Responses due by 3/16/2009 (Auerbach, Melissa)
February 20, 2009 Filing 141 OPINION entered by Judge Richard Mills on 2/20/2009. Defendant Rod Blagojevich's converted motion for summary judgment [d/e 125] is GRANTED. (MAS, ilcd)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion to Set Dispositive Motion Schedule #140 ALLOWED without objection / response. Dispositive motions to be filed by 3/1/2009, responses within 35 days, replies within 28 days. (LB, ilcd)
January 16, 2009 Filing 140 MOTION SET DISPOSITIVE MOTION SCHEDULE by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Responses due by 2/2/2009 (Auerbach, Melissa)
December 23, 2008 Filing 139 Response by Rod Blagojevich re #138 Response to Motion,,,,. (Thompson, James)
December 15, 2008 Filing 138 RESPONSE to Motion re #125 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) Converted to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part A, #2 Exhibit 1, Part B, #3 Exhibit 1, Part C)(Kerley, John)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time [d/e 136] is granted. Additional evidentiary submissions are now due by December 15, 2008.Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 11/14/2008. (MAS, ilcd)
November 12, 2008 Filing 137 RESPONSE to Motion re #136 MOTION for Extension of Time to File additional evidence relating to the converted summary judgment motion filed by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. (Thompson, James)
November 12, 2008 Filing 136 MOTION for Extension of Time to File additional evidence relating to the converted summary judgment motion by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 12/1/2008 (Baker, John)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER entered by Judge Richard Mills on 10/21/2008. The Court grants Blagojevich's motions for a protective order [d/e 100, 115] and hereby prohibits Plaintiffs from deposing him. Blagojevich's motion for judgment on the pleadings [d/e 125] is converted to a motion for summary judgment, and the parties are given an opportunity to submit further evidence on the issues raised. Curry's motions to limit the scope of her deposition [d/e 104, 117] are also granted. In compliance with Rule 12(d), Plaintiffs shall have 21 days from the entry of this order (until 11/12/2008) to add further evidence, if any, relating to the converted summary judgment motion. If any such evidence is presented, Blagojevich will have 14 days to respond. (MAS, ilcd)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Defendants' Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline #134 ALLOWED. Dispositive motion deadline of 10/1/2008 CANCELLED to be reset after the Court rules on various pending motions. The Court sua sponte CANCELS the final pretrial and jury trial settings. (LB, ilcd)
September 17, 2008 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 10/6/2008 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
August 27, 2008 REMARK: Copy of Judge Cudmore's Text Order of August 27, 2008 sent this date via U.S. Mail to Kendra K. Hurd, MA, LCPC, NCC at the provided address of 1009 Rickard Court, Springfield, IL 62704. (LB, ilcd)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Based upon the contents of Defendants State Officials' Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena #133 , and the fact that Melvin Cooper has signed a consent for release of his medical records, Kendra K. Hurd is ordered to comply in full with the subpoena served upon her by Defendants. Defendants' Motion #133 is ALLOWED. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 8/27/08. (LB, ilcd)
August 25, 2008 Filing 133 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 9/11/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Cooper IRROG response, #2 Exhibit 2: Cooper Dep excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3: Cooper Dep Excerpts part 2, #4 Exhibit 4: Hurd subpoena, #5 Exhibit 5: Hurd Response, #6 Exhibit 6: Becker letter)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendant Julie Curry ("Curry") filed a motion [d/e 104] seeking a protective order limiting the scope of her deposition. The Court has not yet ruled on this issue. However, Curry also requests a stay forbidding the taking of her deposition during the pendency of her motion. The stay is GRANTED. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 7/16/2008. (MAS, ilcd)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Buddy Maupin, and Henry Bayer move this Court to continue the trial date [d/e 131, 132]. In light of the current discovery deadlines, this Court grants the motions. The pretrial conference is continued from August 4, 2008, at 2:00 p.m., to December 1, 2008, at 4:00 p.m. The trial is continued from August 5, 2008, at 10:00 a.m., to December 2, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 7/16/2008. (MAS, ilcd)
July 10, 2008 Filing 132 MOTION to Continue the Trial Date by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Responses due by 7/28/2008 (Auerbach, Melissa)
July 8, 2008 Filing 131 MOTION to Continue the Trial Date by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. Responses due by 7/25/2008 (Thompson, James)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The final pretrial conference is hereby continued from July 7, 2008, at 2:00 p.m, to August 4, 2008, at 2:00 p.m. The trial is continued from July 8, 2008, at 10:00 a.m., to August 5, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/30/2008. (MAS, ilcd)
June 27, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: State Officials' Agreed Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadline #130 ALLOWED. Defendants' Expert Disclosure deadline extended to 7/31/2008. Expert Discovery deadline extended to 9/1/2008. (LB, ilcd)
June 27, 2008 Filing 130 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Experts by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 7/14/2008 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
June 23, 2008 Filing 129 RESPONSE to Motion re #125 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time [d/e 128] to file a response is GRANTED. Plaintiffs have until June 23, 2008, to respond to Defendant's renewed motion for judgment on the pleadings. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/11/2008. (MAS, ilcd)
June 9, 2008 Filing 128 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #125 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 6/26/2008 (Baker, John)
June 3, 2008 REMARK: Copy of Judge Cudmore's Text Order of 6/3/2008 regarding Motion #122 sent this date via U.S. Mail to Edward W. Huntley, Chief Legal Counsel, Illinois Dept. of Corrections, Office of Legal Counsel, 1301 Concordia Court, Springfield, IL 62794. (LB, ilcd)
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Based upon the Illinois Dept of Corrections' Response #124 and Plaintiffs' Response #127 , Plaintiffs' Petition for Rule to Show Cause and Motion to Compel Production of Documents from the Illinois Dept of Corrections #122 is DENIED as moot. (LB, ilcd)
June 2, 2008 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #122 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Illinois Department of Corrections filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
May 30, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline #126 ALLOWED. Fact discovery deadline extended to 8/30/2008. Court resets dispositive motion deadline to 10/1/2008. (LB, ilcd)
May 29, 2008 Filing 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 6/16/2008 (Baker, John)
May 22, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Renewed) by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. Responses due by 6/9/2008 (Thompson, James)
May 16, 2008 REMARK: Copy of Judge Cudmore's Text Order of 5/16/2008 in reference to Motion #122 and Response #124 sent this date via U.S. Mail to Edward W. Huntley, Chief Legal Counsel, Illinois Dept. of Corrections, Office of Legal Counsel, 1301 Concordia Court, Springfield, IL 62794. (LB, ilcd)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Plaintiffs to file reply to Illinois Department of Corrections Response #124 on or before 6/2/2008. (LB, ilcd)
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: State Officials' Agreed Motion to Extend the Dates for Expert discovery #123 ALLOWED. Deadline for Defendants' expert disclosures extended to 6/16/2008; deadline for expert discovery extended to 6/30/2008; dispositive motion deadline extended to 8/1/2008; final pretrial and jury trial settings CANCELLED to be reset after the dispositive motion deadline. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 5/16/08. (LB, ilcd)
May 16, 2008 Filing 124 Response to Petition for Rule to Show Cause by Edward W Huntley Chief Counsel on behalf of IL Department of Corrections per an order entered by Honorable Byron G Cudmore dated April 29, 2008. (BH, ilcd)
May 15, 2008 Filing 123 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 6/2/2008 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
April 29, 2008 REMARK: Copy of Judge Cudmore's Text Order of 4/29/2008 in reference to Motion #122 sent this date via U.S. Mail to Illinois Dept. of Corrections, Office of Legal Counsel, 1301 Concordia Court, Springfield, IL 62794. (LB, ilcd)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore; Office of Legal Counsel for the Illinois Department of Corrections to file written response to Plaintiffs' Petition for Rule to Show Cause and Motion to Compel Production of Documents #122 on or before 5/15/2008. (LB, ilcd)
April 28, 2008 Filing 122 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from the Illinois Department of Corrections by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 5/15/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Baker, John)
April 16, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendants' motions for leave to file replies (d/e 120, 121) are granted. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 4/16/2008. (MAS, ilcd)
April 16, 2008 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum Instanter by Defendant Julie Curry. Responses due by 5/5/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1: Noll Dep Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2: Bartman Dep Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3: Byrd Dep Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 4; Gilbert Dep Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 5; Groaning Dep Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6: Harvey Dep Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7: Rees Dep Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8: Roach Dep Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 9: Thorson Dep Excerpts)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
April 15, 2008 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to File A REPLY INSTANTER by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. Responses due by 5/2/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER)(Thompson, James)
April 14, 2008 Filing 119 RESPONSE to Motion regarding Depositions of Rod Blagojevich and Julie Curry filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 2a, #4 Exhibit 2b, #5 Exhibit 3a, #6 Exhibit 3b, #7 Exhibit 4a, #8 Exhibit 4b, #9 Exhibit 5a, #10 Exhibit 5b, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14)(Baker, John)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time (d/e 118) is GRANTED for good cause shown. Plaintiffs have until April 14, 2008, to file their responses to Defendants' motions d/e 100, 104, 115, and 117. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 4/7/2008. (MAS, ilcd)
April 4, 2008 Filing 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 4/21/2008 (Baker, John)
March 28, 2008 Filing 117 MOTION to Supplement #104 MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition MOTION to Stay hr Deposition Pending the Court's RUling Regarding the Scope of her Deposition MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition, #100 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (Renewed)Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (Renewed) by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry. Responses due by 4/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Buscher dep, #2 Exhibit A; Buscher dep part 2, #3 Exhibit A: Buscher dep part 3, #4 Exhibit A1:Buscher affidavit, #5 Exhibit Group Ex A2, #6 Exhibit Ex A2 part 2, #7 Exhibit Ex A2 part 3)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
March 21, 2008 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Support re #115 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (to the pending renewed motion #100 ) filed by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. (Thompson, James)
March 21, 2008 Filing 115 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (to the pending renewed motion #100 ) by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. Responses due by 4/7/2008 (Thompson, James)
March 13, 2008 Filing 114 OPINION entered by Judge Richard Mills on 3/13/2008. Plaintiffs' Objections (d/e 112) are DENIED. (MAS, ilcd)
March 12, 2008 Filing 113 Response by Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood re #112 Objection,,,,. (Gagliardo, Joseph)
February 29, 2008 Filing 112 OBJECTION to Rulings of the Magistrate Judge by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time (d/e 111) to file their response to Defendants motions (d/e 100, 104) is granted. The Plaintiffs have until April 4, 2008, to file their response. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 2/29/2008. (MAS, ilcd)
February 28, 2008 Filing 111 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #104 MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition MOTION to Stay hr Deposition Pending the Court's RUling Regarding the Scope of her Deposition MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition, #100 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (Renewed)Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (Renewed) by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 3/17/2008 (Baker, John)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: State Officials' Agreed Motion to Extend the Dates for Expert Discovery #110 ALLOWED. Deadline for Defendants' expert disclosures extended to 5/16/2008; Deadline for expert discovery extended to 5/30/2008. (LB, ilcd)
February 15, 2008 Filing 110 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 3/3/2008 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Governor Blagojevich's Motion to Stay his Deposition Pending the Court's Ruling on his Renewed Motion for a Protective Order #105 ALLOWED. Deposition of the Governor STAYED in this matter until the Court has ruled upon his Renewed Motion for a Protective Order #100 . (LB, ilcd)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Before the Court are Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff Jacques Beardsley to Supplement State Officials' Interrogatory No. 19 or Bar Him from Submitting Evidence Related to Medical Treatment and/or Counseling #101 , Motion to Compel Norma Bartman, Jacques Beardsley, Lori Oakley, and Glenn Malone to Provide Consent to Release Medical Records, or to Bar Them from Submitting Evidence Related to Medical Treatment and/or Counseling #102 , and Motion to Continue the Depositions of Plaintiffs Colleen Bagley, Steven Best, William Carrell, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Lloyd DeJaynes, Tony Elder, Kent Janssen, Ron Kolweier, Julia Lynn, Deborah Seeman, and Eric Welch #103 , and Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response #109 . Plaintiffs' counsel advises Plaintiff Beardsley will not claim any emotional distress damages, therefore Motion #101 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' counsel advises certain medical consents have been provided to Defendants or will be provided to Defendants by 3/15/2008, therefore Defendants' Motion #102 DENIED without prejudice based upon those representations of Plaintiffs' counsel. Defendants' Motion #103 ALLOWED in part. Plaintiffs Colleen Bagley, Steven Best, William Carrell, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Lloyd DeJaynes, Tony Elder, Kent Janssen, Ron Kolweier, Julia Lynn, Deborah Seeman, and Eric Welch are ORDERED to appear for the continuation of their depositions. Each deposition limited to a total of two hours in duration. Only new material / issues can be addressed in their supplemental depositions. The supplemental depositions to be held at Plaintiffs' counsel's offices in Springfield, Illinois. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 2/15/08. (LB, ilcd)
February 14, 2008 Filing 109 RESPONSE to Motion re #101 MOTION to Compel Jacques Beardsley to Supplement State Official's Interrogatory 19 or Bar Him from Submitting Evidence Related to Medical Treatment and/or Counseling, #102 MOTION to Compel Bartman, Beardsley Oakley and Malone to Provide Consent to Release Medical Records or to Bar them from Submitting Evidence Related to Medical Treatment and/or Counseling, #103 MOTION to Continue the Deposiitons of bagley, Best, Carrell, Compton, Cooper, DeJaynes, Elder, Janssen, Kolweir, Lynn, Seeman and Welch filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
February 14, 2008 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sean G Wieber on behalf of Rod Blagojevich (Wieber, Sean)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions for Protective Order #107 ALLOWED. Responses to Motions #100 #104 due 3/3/2008.(LB, ilcd)
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline #106 ALLOWED. Fact discovery extended to 5/30/2008; dispositive motion deadline extended to 6/15/2008; ALL other deadlines remain in effect. (LB, ilcd)
February 11, 2008 Filing 107 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #104 MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition MOTION to Stay hr Deposition Pending the Court's RUling Regarding the Scope of her Deposition MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition, #100 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (Renewed)Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (Renewed) by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 2/28/2008 (Baker, John)
February 11, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 2/28/2008 (Baker, John)
January 28, 2008 Filing 105 MOTION to Stay re #104 MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition MOTION to Stay hr Deposition Pending the Court's RUling Regarding the Scope of her Deposition MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. Responses due by 2/14/2008 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
January 25, 2008 Filing 104 MOTION for Protective Order (RENEWED) Limiting the Scope of her Deposition, MOTION to Stay hr Deposition Pending the Court's RUling Regarding the Scope of her Deposition by Defendant Julie Curry. Responses due by 2/11/2008 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
January 23, 2008 Filing 103 MOTION to Continue the Deposiitons of bagley, Best, Carrell, Compton, Cooper, DeJaynes, Elder, Janssen, Kolweir, Lynn, Seeman and Welch by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 2/11/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pl IRROGS part 1, #2 Exhibit Pl IRROGS part 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Bagley Dep excerpts, #4 Exhibit Ex 3: carrell Dep Excerpts, #5 Exhibit Ex 4: Bagley damage calcs, #6 Exhibit Ex 5: Carrell damage calcs, #7 Exhibit Ex 6: Cooper damage calcs, #8 Exhibit DeJaynes Damage calcs, #9 Exhibit Ex 8: Elder damage calcs, #10 Exhibit Ex 9: Lynn Damage calcs, #11 Exhibit Ex 10: Seeman damage calcs, #12 Exhibit Ex 11: Bagley Dep excerpts, #13 Exhibit Ex 12: DeJaynes dep excerpts, #14 Exhibit Ex 13: Elder dep excerpts, #15 Exhibit Ex 14: Lynn Dep Excerpts, #16 Exhibit Ex 15: Seeman dep excerpts, #17 Exhibit Ex 16: Cooper dep excerpts, #18 Exhibit Ex 17: Best dep excertps, #19 Exhibit Ex 18: Best Suppl IRROGS, #20 Exhibit Ex 19: Compton Dep excertps, #21 Exhibit Ex 20: Compton Damage calcs, #22 Exhibit Ex 21: Compton Suppl IRROGS, #23 Exhibit Ex 22: Janssen dep excerpts, #24 Exhibit Ex 23: Janssen Damage calcs, #25 Exhibit Ex 24: Janssen Suppl IRROGS, #26 Exhibit Kolweir Dep excerpts, #27 Exhibit Ex 26: Kolweir Damage calcs, #28 Exhibit Ex 27: Kolweir Suppl IRROGS, #29 Exhibit Ex 28: Welch damage calcs, #30 Exhibit Ex 29: Welch Suppl IRROGS)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
January 23, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION to Compel Bartman, Beardsley Oakley and Malone to Provide Consent to Release Medical Records or to Bar them from Submitting Evidence Related to Medical Treatment and/or Counseling by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 2/11/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bartman IRROG Answers, #2 Exhibit Beardsley IRROG Answers, #3 Exhibit Beardsley Dep Excerpts, #4 Exhibit Beardsley Damage Calcs, #5 Exhibit Oakley Amended IRROG Answers, #6 Exhibit Malone IRROG answers, #7 Exhibit Malone Dep Excerpts)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
January 23, 2008 Filing 101 MOTION to Compel Jacques Beardsley to Supplement State Official's Interrogatory 19 or Bar Him from Submitting Evidence Related to Medical Treatment and/or Counseling by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 2/11/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Beadrdsley Answers to IRROG, #2 Exhibit Beardsley Dep excerpts, #3 Exhibit Beardsley Damage Calcs, #4 Exhibit Correspondence, #5 Exhibit Correspondence)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
January 23, 2008 Filing 100 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order (Renewed) by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. Responses due by 2/11/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Req to Admit, #3 Exhibit Req to Admit, #4 Exhibit Kerr RTA Answer, #5 Exhibit memo in Opp to Prohibit Dep)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
January 14, 2008 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Answer to Curry, Walker, Smock & Underwood's Supplemental Interrogatory by John Edward Kerley on behalf of Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard (Kerley, John)
January 14, 2008 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Response to Curry, Walker, Smock & Underwood Supplemental Document Request by John Edward Kerley on behalf of Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard (Kerley, John)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline #96 ALLOWED. Fact discovery deadline extended to 2/28/2008. Dispositive motions deadline extended to 3/15/2008. All other deadlines remain in effect. (LB, ilcd)
December 17, 2007 Filing 97 Exhibit re #96 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
December 17, 2007 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 1/3/2008 (Baker, John)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Agreed Motion to Extend the Date for Defendants to Identify Expert Witnesses #95 ALLOWED. Defendants' expert disclosure deadline extended to 2/15/2008; Expert discovery deadline extended to 3/1/2008. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 12/14/07. (LB, ilcd)
December 14, 2007 Filing 95 MOTION to Extend the Date for Defendants to Identify Expert Witnesses (Agreed) by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 12/31/2007 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Because of U.S. District Judge Mills' Opinion #94 , the stay of fact discovery entered 12/5/2007 is lifted. All current deadlines remain in effect. Fact discovery to be completed by 1/1/2008. (LB, ilcd)
December 7, 2007 Filing 94 OPINION entered by Judge Richard Mills on 12/7/2007. Governor Blagojevich's "Motion to Dismiss" (d/e 74) is converted to a motion for judgment on the pleadings under Rule 12(c) and DENIED. Further, Governor Blagojevich's (d/e 71) and Curry's (d/e 76) Motions for Protective Orders are also DENIED. (MAS, ilcd)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Discovery #91 and Defendants' Response #93 reviewed. Plaintiffs' Motion #91 ALLOWED. However, discovery pertaining to Plaintiffs' damages claims may continue. In addition, the Court finds that any motion pertaining to depositions impacted by the Court's resolution of the legislative immunity issue must be filed within 60 days following the lifting of the stay ordered herein. (See Response #93 , paragraph 1). Defendants' deadline to disclose experts remains 12/14/2007. The Court wants that aspect of the case to move forward. Expert discovery deadline remains 1/1/2008. Dispositive motion deadline, final pretrial and jury trial dates remain as scheduled pending further order of Court. (LB, ilcd)
November 29, 2007 Filing 93 RESPONSE to Motion re #91 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. (Gagliardo, Joseph)
November 28, 2007 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Answers to Supplemental Interrogatories by John Edward Kerley on behalf of Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard (Kerley, John)
November 21, 2007 Filing 91 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 12/10/2007 (Baker, John)
November 15, 2007 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard Their Responses to Defendant's Curry, Walker, Jr., Smock and Underwood's Request to Admit (Kerley, John)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Requests to Admit Propounded by Defendants #89 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 11/14/2007. (LB, ilcd)
October 31, 2007 Filing 89 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Requests to Admit by Plaintiff Steve Bigelow. Responses due by 11/19/2007 (Kerley, John)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Agreed Motion to Extend the Date for Defendants to Identify Expert Witnesses #88 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 12/14/2007. (LB, ilcd)
October 12, 2007 Filing 88 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Date for Defendants to Identify Expert Witnesses by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 10/29/2007 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
October 5, 2007 Filing 87 REPLY Memorandum in Support of Their Motions for Protective Orders filed by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry. (CC, ilcd)
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Blagojevich and Curry's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum Instanter #86 ALLOWED. Clerk directed to docket Reply Memorandum attached to Motion #86 . (CC, ilcd)
October 5, 2007 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum Instanter by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Reply Memorandum)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Before the Court is the State Officials' Motion to Compel and/or Bar #79 and the Bagley Plaintiffs' Response #85 . As an initial matter, the Court appreciates the magnitude of the pre-trial discovery in a case such as this and congratulates the parties for their efforts. Based upon Bagley Plaintiffs' Response #85 , it appears all damage calculations have been provided or mailed in discovery as of 10/2/2007 (see page 2 of #85 ). However, the State Officials require that each damage calculation be verified under oath so as to allow proper preparation for trial. The Court does find that the damage calculations are in fact supplemented responses to their interrogatory answers and therefore must be certified / verified by each Bagley Plaintiff. Said certification / verification to be submitted to the State Officials by 10/15/2007. Wherefore Motion to Compel and/or Bar #79 is ALLOWED. No fees or costs are awarded.Entered by Judge Cudmore on 10/2/07. (LB, ilcd)
October 1, 2007 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #79 MOTION to Compel and/or Bar filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baker, John)
October 1, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Discovery #83 ALLOWED ONLY IN PART. Extension granted to 11/1/2007 to respond to outstanding discovery from Defendants Blagojevich, Curry, Walker, Smock and Underwood. Plaintiffs' response to Motion to Compel #79 still due and owing 10/1/2007. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 10/1/07. (LB, ilcd)
September 28, 2007 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #83 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery OBJECTIONS TO MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO ALL OUTSDANDING WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND REQUESTS TO ADMIT PROPOUNDED BY DEFENDANTS filed by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. (Auerbach, Melissa)
September 28, 2007 Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 10/15/2007 (Kerley, John)
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Motion for Extension of Time #80 ALLOWED. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law #82 filed timely. (LB, ilcd)
September 24, 2007 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #71 MOTION for Reconsideration re #64 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, #76 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Her Deposition filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baker, John)
September 24, 2007 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
September 21, 2007 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #75 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #72 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #71 MOTION for Reconsideration re #64 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, #74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #76 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Her Deposition by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 10/9/2007 (Baker, John)
September 13, 2007 Filing 79 MOTION to Compel and/or Bar by Defendants Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. Responses due by 10/1/2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bagley Damage Calculations, #2 Exhibit Letter)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time #78 ALLOWED. Plaintiffs granted extension to 9/21/2007 to respond to Motions #71 #74 #76 . Entered by Judge Cudmore on 9/12/07. (LB, ilcd)
September 11, 2007 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #75 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #72 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #64 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #71 MOTION for Reconsideration re #64 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, #74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #76 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Her Deposition by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 9/28/2007 (Kerley, John)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time #77 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 9/11/2007 to respond to Motions #71 #74 #76 . Entered by Judge Cudmore on 9/5/07. (LB, ilcd)
September 4, 2007 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #75 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #72 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #71 MOTION for Reconsideration re #64 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, #74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #76 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Her Deposition by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 9/21/2007 (Baker, John)
August 9, 2007 UTILITY: Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #76 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Her Deposition, #74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #71 MOTION for Reconsideration re #64 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Responses due by 9/1/2007 (LB, ilcd)
August 9, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Status Conference held on 8/9/2007. Scheduling Issues Discussed. Plaintiffs granted until 9/1/2007 to respond to Defendants' Motions #71 #74 #76 . No replies to be filed by Defendants without leave of Court. Plaintiffs granted until 10/1/2007 to respond to discovery request from Defendants received on 8/2/2007. Fact and expert discovery deadlines extended to 1/1/2008. Deadline for Defendants to disclose expert witnesses extended to 10/15/2007. Dispositive motion deadline extended to 3/1/2008. Final pretrial set 1/7/2008 CANCELLED and reset 7/7/2008 at 2:00 PM before U.S. District Judge Richard Mills. Jury Trial set 2/5/2008 CANCELLED and reset 7/8/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mills. (LB, ilcd)
August 8, 2007 Filing 76 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Her Deposition by Defendant Julie Curry. Responses due by 8/27/2007 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
August 7, 2007 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Support re #74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. (Thompson, James)
August 7, 2007 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. Responses due by 8/24/2007 (Thompson, James)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Agreed Motion to Extend the Date for Defendants to Identify Expert Witnesses #73 ALLOWED. Deadline for Defendants to disclose expert witnesses extended to 9/15/2007. Expert Discovery to close 10/15/2007. The Court sua sponte extends the dispositive motion deadline to 11/15/2007. Final pretrial and jury trial settings remain as scheduled. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 8/1/07. (LB, ilcd)
August 1, 2007 Filing 73 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to xtend Date for Defendants to Identify Expert Witnesses by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits, Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer, James Underwood. Responses due by 8/20/2007 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
July 25, 2007 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support re #71 MOTION for Reconsideration re #64 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, filed by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. (Thompson, James)
July 25, 2007 Filing 71 MOTION for Reconsideration re #64 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, by Defendant Rod Blagojevich. Responses due by 8/13/2007 (Thompson, James)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendants Maupin and Bayer's Motion to Extend Date for Defendants to Idenfity Experts #68 ALLOWED. Defendants are to identify testifying experts and to provide expert reports by 8/15/2007. (LB, ilcd)
June 29, 2007 Filing 70 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Amendment to #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendants Maupin and Bayer's Motion to Extend Date for Defendants to Indentify Experts and Provide Expert Reports AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Auerbach, Melissa)
June 29, 2007 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Stephen A Yokich on behalf of Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer (Yokich, Stephen)
June 29, 2007 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendants Maupin and Bayer's Motion to Extend Date for Defendants to Indentify Experts and Provide Expert Reports by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Responses due by 7/16/2007 (Auerbach, Melissa)
June 29, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendants' Motion to Compel and/or Bar #60 and Plaintiffs' Response #66 reviewed. The Court finds Defendants' Motion to be timely based upon the dates listed in the submissions of the parties. The Court notes Plaintiffs, at page 3 of their Response #66 , state they "fully intend to provide the Defendants with the requested damages calculations". Defendants' Motion #60 ALLOWED in part in that Plaintiffs are directed to answer Interrogatory #14 and supplement their initial disclosures pertaining to damages by 7/16/2007. Defendants' motion to bar is DENIED. Each side to bear their own costs. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 6/29/07. (LB, ilcd)
June 28, 2007 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re #60 MOTION to Compel and/or Bar filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Baker, John)
June 28, 2007 MINUTE ENTRY: Telephonic conference held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore. Present Attorneys John A. Baker, John E. Kerley, Joseph M. Gagliardo, Jeffrey S. Fowler, James R. Thompson, Melissa J. Auerbach, and Heather R.M. Becker. (James R. Thompson allowed to participate as counsel for Governor Blagojevich as he is taking steps to gain admission to the bar of the Central District of Illinois. He is advised to complete administrative process forthwith so he can be listed of record herein.) Deposition date for Governor Blagojevich discussed. By agreement of the parties, said deposition will not be conducted until after the current Illinois legislative session ends - probably late August, 2007. Court directs parties to continue with discovery. Telephone status conference set Thursday, 8/9/2007, at 10:00 a.m. Attorney Thompson advises he may be seeking a protective order or other relief on the scope of Governor Blagojevich's deposition or otherwise based upon privilege. Attorney Thompson requested to file appropriate motion(s), if any, on this topic as soon as practicable. All current deadlines remain in effect pending further order of Court.(LB, ilcd)
June 27, 2007 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James R Thompson on behalf of Rod Blagojevich (MC, ilcd)
June 26, 2007 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic conference set for Thursday, 6/28/2007, at 10:00 AM (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore concerning discovery matters.(LB, ilcd)
June 22, 2007 Filing 65 OPINION entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/22/2007: Governor Blagojevich's emergency motion [d/e 62] is ALLOWED to the extent that the deposition set for June 25, 2007 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby STAYED. The parties are DIRECTED to contact United States Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore during the week of June 25, 2007. A conference call will be held for the purpose of scheduling the Governor's deposition. Any other pertinent matters can be addressed at that time. (MAS, ilcd)
June 22, 2007 Filing 64 OPINION entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/22/2007: The motion of Governor Blagojevich to reconsider and for a protective order [d/e 56] is DENIED. The Governor's supplemental motion for a protective order [d/e 58] is DENIED. (MAS, ilcd)
June 22, 2007 Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Baker, John)
June 22, 2007 Filing 62 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Rod Blagojevich.Responses due by 7/9/2007 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Judge Richard Mills: Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Further Support of His Motion to Reconsider and for a Protective Order Instanter (d/e 61) is ALLOWED. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/21/2007. (MAS, ilcd)
June 21, 2007 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Further Support of His Motion to Reconsider and for a Protective Order Instanter by Defendant Rod Blagojevich.Responses due by 7/9/2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Further Reply Brief)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Motion to Compel and/or Bar #60 by 6/28/2007. The Court apologizes for the expedited response date. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 6/20/07. (LB, ilcd)
June 20, 2007 Filing 60 MOTION to Compel and/or Bar by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood.Responses due by 7/9/2007 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
June 19, 2007 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM of law in Response to Defendants' Motion and Supplemental Motion for Reconsideration re #58 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order, #56 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Propriety of Taking the Deposition of the Governor MOTION for Reconsideration re #55 Order, MOTION for Reconsideration re #55 Order, by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Baker, John)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #57 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 6/19/2007.(LB, ilcd)
June 19, 2007 Filing 58 Supplemental MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Rod Blagojevich.Responses due by 7/6/2007 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
June 18, 2007 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motionto Reconsider regarding the Propriety of taking the Deposition of Governor Blagojevich by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits.Responses due by 7/5/2007 (Baker, John)
May 30, 2007 Filing 56 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Propriety of Taking the Deposition of the Governor, MOTION for Reconsideration re #55 Order, by Defendant Rod Blagojevich.Responses due by 6/18/2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IRROG Responses)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
May 10, 2007 Filing 55 OPINION entered by Judge Richard Mills on 5/10/2007. The Court ADOPTS Judge Cudmore's March 28, 2007, Opinion in its entirety and DENIES the Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Propriety of Taking the Deposition of the Governor (d/e 52). (Attachment: #1 Appendix (Opinion of 3/28/2007))(MAS, ilcd)
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendant State Officials' Motion for Leave to Amend their Answers Instanter #51 ALLOWED. No objection / response filed. Telephone status conference set 5/2/2007 at 11:00 a.m. CANCELLED. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 4/27/07. (LB, ilcd)
April 26, 2007 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM of law in Response to Defendants Objection to Magistrate Judge Cudmore's Ruling regarding the Deposition of Governor Rod Blagojevich by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Judge Richard Mills: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (d/e 53) is ALLOWED. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's objections is due April 26, 2007. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 4/25/2007. (MAS, ilcd)
April 24, 2007 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding the Propriety of Taking the Deposition of the Governor by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits.Responses due by 5/11/2007 (Baker, John)
April 10, 2007 Filing 52 OBJECTION Rule 72(a) to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding the Propriety of Taking the Deposition of the Governor to #49 Order by Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood. (Gagliardo, Joseph)
April 9, 2007 Filing 51 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers Instanter by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood.Responses due by 4/26/2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bagley Amended Answer#2 Exhibit Bigelow Amended Answer)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
April 6, 2007 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Bigelow for Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants Maupin and Bayers First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Kerley, John)
March 28, 2007 Filing 49 OPINION concerning #46 entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 3/28/07. (LB, ilcd)
March 22, 2007 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jeffrey S Fowler on behalf of Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock (Fowler, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2007 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to Motion to Prohibit the Taking of the Deposition of Governor Blagojevich by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4)(Baker, John)
February 27, 2007 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM of law regarding the propriety of taking the deposition of the Governor by Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock. (Gagliardo, Joseph)
February 15, 2007 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Doug Vinyard for Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories and Responses to Defendants' Document Requests (Kerley, John)
February 15, 2007 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Snyder for Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories and Responses to Defendants' Document Requests (Kerley, John)
February 15, 2007 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roger Ruppel for Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories and Responses to Defendants' Document Requests (Kerley, John)
February 15, 2007 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Mountain for Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories and Responses to Defendants' Document Requests (Kerley, John)
February 15, 2007 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jim Luth for Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories and Responses to Defendants' Document Requests (Kerley, John)
February 15, 2007 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leon Kerr for Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories and Responses to Defendants' Document Requests (Kerley, John)
February 15, 2007 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Bigelow for Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories and Responses to Defendants' Document Requests (Kerley, John)
January 30, 2007 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Carrie Alice Herschman on behalf of Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer (Herschman, Carrie)
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Joint Status Report of the Parties #37 reviewed. Telephonic status conference set 1/18/2007 CANCELLED. Briefing schedule on issue of Governor Blagojevich's deposition set as follows: Defendants to submit a brief outlining the reasons for their objections to producing Governor Blagojevich no later than 3/1/2007; Plainitffs to submit a response no later than 3/15/2007. Telephonic status conference reset for Wednesday, 5/2/2007, at 11:00 AM by telephone (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore.(LB, ilcd)
January 17, 2007 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT of the Parties by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, James Underwood, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
November 29, 2006 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Bigelow (Kerley, John)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Written Discovery #33 ALLOWED. Plaintiffs granted until 11/29/2006 to propound initial discovery requests. Defendants granted until 3/1/2007 to respond. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 11/20/06. (LB, ilcd)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendant's Response #35 is STRICKEN as it is duplicative of Response #34 .(LB, ilcd)
November 16, 2006 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Serve Written Discovery DEFENDANTS MAUPIN AND BAYER'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SERVE WRITTEN DISCOVERY filed by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. (Auerbach, Melissa)
November 16, 2006 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Serve Written Discovery DEFENDANTS MAUPIN AND BAYER'S RESONSE TO PLANTIFFS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SERVE WRITTEN DISCOVERY filed by Defendant Buddy Maupin. (Auerbach, Melissa)
November 15, 2006 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Serve Written Discovery by Plaintiff Colleen Bagley.Responses due by 11/29/2006 (Kerley, John)
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Based upon Plaintiffs' Response #32 showing compliance, Defendants' Motions to Compel #29 #30 are DENIED as moot, each side to bear their own costs. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 11/6/06. (LB, ilcd)
November 3, 2006 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce MOTION to Produce Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, #29 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
November 3, 2006 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service. (Baker, John)
October 27, 2006 Filing 30 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce, MOTION to Produce Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, James Underwood.Responses due by 11/10/2006 (Becker, Heather)
October 20, 2006 Filing 29 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer.Responses due by 11/3/2006 (Auerbach, Melissa)
September 22, 2006 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steve Bigelow For Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) (Kerley, John)
August 9, 2006 UTILITY: Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/16/2007. (LB, ilcd)
August 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Attorneys John A. Baker, John E. Kerley, Lawrence J. Weiner, Jeffrey Fowler, and Melissa J. Auerbach present by telephone for Rule 16 conference; Same held at 2:00 PM on 8/8/2006; SCHEDULING TIME LIMITS ORDERED: Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2006.,Discovery due by 8/30/2007.,Defendant`s Expert Disclosure due by 7/15/2007.,Plaintiff`s Expert Disclosure due by 6/1/2007.,Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2007.,Initial Disclosures due by 9/15/2006.,Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2006.,Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2007., Final Pretrial Conference set 1/7/2008 at 2:30 PM before U.S. District Judge Richard Mills, Jury Trial set 2/5/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mills, Status Conference set 1/18/2007 at 2:00 PM by telephone (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore (Status Report due 1/16/2007). See written order signed by Judge Cudmore on 8/9/06. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Memorandum#2 Courtroom Technology Brochure)(LB, ilcd)
August 8, 2006 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Byron G. Cudmore: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2006. Written Scheduling Order to follow. (LB, ilcd)
August 8, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore finding as moot #25 Plaintiffs' Motion for One Day Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order.(LB, ilcd)
August 7, 2006 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
August 4, 2006 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Steve Bigelow, Leon Kerr, Jim Luth, Jeffrey Clapp, Mark Mountain, Roger Ruppel, Steve Snyder, Doug Vinyard, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 8/18/2006 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baker, John)
July 20, 2006 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification: Plaintiffs Bigelow, Kerr, Luth, Mountain, Ruppel, Snyder, Vinyard and defendant Underwood from case 05:3209 added as parties to this case. (CT, ilcd)
July 20, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: (from case 05-3209) Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion for Consolidation #17 ALLOWED. This cause (05-CV-3209) consolidated in all respects with Case #05-CV-3156, Bagley, et al. v. Blagojevich, et al. Case #05-CV-3156 will be the lead case. Court advises parties in 05-CV-3209 that a telephonic Rule 16 conference is set in 05-CV-3156 on 8/8/2006 at 2:00 p.m. Entered by Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 7/20/2006. (CT, ilcd)
July 6, 2006 NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 8/8/2006, at 2:00 PM by telephone (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Byron G. Cudmore. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 8/4/2006. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(E) with proposed deadlines. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. If lead counsel is unavailable to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing, the scheduling hearing will be cancelled and costs may be assessed. (LB, ilcd)
June 30, 2006 Filing 24 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First) by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer.(Auerbach, Melissa)
June 14, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Defendants Buddy Maupin and Henry Bayer directed to file an answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before 6/30/2006.(LB, ilcd)
June 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER (OPINION) entered by Judge Richard Mills on 06/12/2006: Defendant Maupin and Bayer's Amended Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (d/e 18) is DENIED. (MAS, ilcd)
March 16, 2006 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Their Affirmative Defenses To by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock.(Gagliardo, Joseph)
February 27, 2006 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore ALLOWING Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time #20 to file response re #18 Amended Motion to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Extension granted to 2/27/2006. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 2/23/06. (LB, ilcd)
February 23, 2006 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #19 Memorandum by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 3/9/2006 (Baker, John)
February 14, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Judge Richard Mills: On November 7, 2005, the Defendants moved the Court to dismiss the Plaintiffs' Complaint. Prior to a ruling on the merits, the Plaintiffs amended their Complaint. The Defendants filed a Motion to Dismiss on February 9, 2006, and an Amended Motion to Dismiss that same day. The Amended Motion to Dismiss moots the other two motions to dismiss. Ergo, both the first Motion to Dismiss (d/e 7) and the second Motion to Dismiss (d/e 16) are DENIED AS MOOT. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 2/14/2006. (MAS, ilcd)
February 9, 2006 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM (AMENDED) IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. (Auerbach, Melissa)
February 9, 2006 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Buddy Maupin. Responses due by 2/23/2006 (Auerbach, Melissa)
February 9, 2006 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. (Auerbach, Melissa)
February 9, 2006 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Responses due by 2/23/2006 (Auerbach, Melissa)
February 1, 2006 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits.(Baker, John)
January 18, 2006 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Judge Richard Mills: Defendants Bayer and Maupin have filed a Motion to Dismiss. In response to that motion, the Defendants have moved the Court for leave to amend their Complaint. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) provides that leave to amend shall be freely given when justice so requires. Id. In this case, justice requires that Plaintiffs be given an opportunity to amend their Complaint so that its merits may be presented to the Court. For this reason, the Plaintiffs are given until February 1, 2006, to file an amended complaint. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 1/18/2006. (MAS, ilcd)
December 21, 2005 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: #14 Defendants' Motion to File an Amended Answer ALLOWED. (LB, ilcd)
December 21, 2005 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer Instanter (Agreed) by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock. Responses due by 1/4/2006 (Attachments: #1)(Gagliardo, Joseph)
December 16, 2005 Filing 13 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer.(Gagliardo, Joseph)
December 5, 2005 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
November 21, 2005 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore ALLOWING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 Motion to Dismiss. Extension granted to 12/5/2005. Entered by Judge Cudmore on 11/21/05. (LB, ilcd)
November 21, 2005 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. Responses due by 12/5/2005 (Baker, John)
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Judge Richard Mills: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Memorandum With Corrected Title (d/e 9) is ALLOWED. Accordingly, Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion of Buddy Maupin and Henry Bayer to Dismiss Statement of Facts (d/e 8) is STRICKEN. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 11/8/2005. (MAS, ilcd)
November 7, 2005 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF BUDDY MAUPIN AND HENRY BAYER TO DISMISS re #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS by Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. (Auerbach, Melissa)
November 7, 2005 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Responses due by 11/21/2005 (Auerbach, Melissa)
November 7, 2005 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF BUDDY MAUPIN AND HENRY BAYER TO DISMISS STATEMENT OF FACTS by Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. (Auerbach, Melissa)
November 7, 2005 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Buddy Maupin, Henry Bayer. Responses due by 11/21/2005 (Auerbach, Melissa)
November 7, 2005 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Melissa J Auerbach on behalf of Buddy Maupin (Auerbach, Melissa)
November 7, 2005 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Melissa J Auerbach on behalf of Henry Bayer (Auerbach, Melissa)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore ALLOWING #4 Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, and Justin Smock answers due 12/16/2005. (LB, ilcd)
November 4, 2005 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, ot Otherwise Plead In Response to the Complaint (Agreed) by Defendants Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock. Responses due by 11/18/2005 (Gagliardo, Joseph)
September 14, 2005 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to each defendant on 9/7/2005 by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Attachments: #1)(Baker, John)
September 7, 2005 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, Henry Bayer, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman, Jim Suits. (Baker, John)
June 24, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rod Blagojevich, Julie Curry, Roger E Walker, Jr, Justin Smock, Buddy Maupin and Henry Bayer filed by Virgil Taylor, Elizabeth Thorson, Misty Valestin, Calvin Wallace, Steven Ward, Kenneth Bishop, Eric Welch, John West, John Wheat, Stephen Widger, Rickey Williams, Venita Wright, James Brown, Lawrence Burton, Luther Byrd, William Carrell, Michael Chapman, Jeffrey Clapp, William Clardy, Joseph Compton, Melvin Cooper, Colleen Bagley, Joseph Cowan, Lloyd Dejaynes, Tony Elder, Tim Elliott, Frank Fairless, Ronald Gilbert, Billy Groaning, Anthony Harvey, Christopher Hughes, Jeffrey Hughes, Norma Bartman, Kent Janssen, Randy Jenkins, Stephen King, Ronald Kolweier, Calvin Landis, Kevin Laskey, Julia Lynn, Glenn Malone, Stephen Mattox, Richard McDonald, Jacques Beardsley, Tim McGrew, Paul. Morgan, Stanley Noll, Lori Oakley, William Rees, Russell Reynolds, Donald Riveria, Larry Roach, Kent Rohe, James Russell, Steven Best, Richard Samuelson, Curtland Sawyer, Andrew Schott, Deborah Seeman and Jim Suits.Filing fee of $ 250.00 paid; receipt # S006362. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagley et al v. Blagojevich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Rohe
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John West
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Gilbert
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Thorson
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul . Morgan
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bishop
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Compton
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Welch
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Best
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mountain
Represented By: John Edward Kerley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Mattox
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Bigelow
Represented By: John Edward Kerley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtland Sawyer
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Burton
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Noll
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Cooper
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Widger
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Suits
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Riveria
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Dejaynes
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Oakley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Bagley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Elder
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Laskey
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McDonald
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Vinyard
Represented By: John Edward Kerley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Lynn
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Valestin
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Luth
Represented By: John Edward Kerley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques Beardsley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Reynolds
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rees
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Harvey
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Roach
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Elliott
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chapman
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Carrell
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Kolweier
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Clardy
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venita Wright
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Malone
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Groaning
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ward
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Janssen
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Schott
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen King
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Jenkins
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim McGrew
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Taylor
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Williams
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Fairless
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Clapp
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Bartman
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Ruppel
Represented By: John Edward Kerley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Landis
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cowan
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Seeman
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wheat
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Russell
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Kerr
Represented By: John Edward Kerley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Wallace
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Byrd
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Snyder
Represented By: John Edward Kerley
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hughes
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Samuelson
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Hughes
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger E Walker, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey S Fowler
Represented By: Heather RM Becker
Represented By: Lawrence J Weiner
Represented By: Joseph M Gagliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Bayer
Represented By: Melissa J Auerbach
Represented By: Stephen A Yokich
Represented By: Carrie Alice Herschman
Represented By: Lawrence J Weiner
Represented By: Joseph M Gagliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Smock
Represented By: Jeffrey S Fowler
Represented By: Heather RM Becker
Represented By: Lawrence J Weiner
Represented By: Joseph M Gagliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Curry
Represented By: Jeffrey S Fowler
Represented By: Heather RM Becker
Represented By: Lawrence J Weiner
Represented By: Joseph M Gagliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Underwood
Represented By: Heather RM Becker
Represented By: Lawrence J Weiner
Represented By: Joseph M Gagliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddy Maupin
Represented By: Melissa J Auerbach
Represented By: Stephen A Yokich
Represented By: Carrie Alice Herschman
Represented By: Lawrence J Weiner
Represented By: Joseph M Gagliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Blagojevich
Represented By: Jeffrey S Fowler
Represented By: Sean G Wieber
Represented By: James Robert Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Heather RM Becker
Represented By: Lawrence J Weiner
Represented By: Joseph M Gagliardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edward W Huntley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?