Lewis et al v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: Michael W Lewis, Mark Telford, Emmanuel Carter, Sammie Franklin, Eugene Brown, William Cummings, William Doss, David Phillips, L G Phillips, Stephen Simons, Tommy Marshall, John Fleenor, James Vance, Kenneth Seidler, Donnie Barrett, Jose Diaz, Forest Biggs and David Isbell
Defendant: Larry J Phillips, Shan Jumper, Guy Groot, Aimee Wilczynski, Julie Oberhausen, Robert Olt and All other Liberty Employees who are in direct violation complainted of herein
Case Number: 3:2010cv03163
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
County: Schuyler
Presiding Judge: Harold A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Charles H. Evans
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 OPINION Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 06/30/2017. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. (1) Defendant's motion for summary judgment is denied (d/e 263 ). (2) This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. (3) The clerk is directed to inform the Magistrate Judge of the referral of this case for a settlement conference. (DM, ilcd)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 9/17/2014. Defendant Brown's motions for extensions are denied, d/e 235 and 236 . The motions to voluntarily dismiss by Plaintiffs Diaz, Barrett, and Phillips are denied, d/e's 231 , 232 and 233 . Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a supplemental summary judgment motion, d/e 157 is terminated. Defendants' supplemntal motions for summary judgment are granted, d/e 204 and 206 . All deadlines and settings on the Co urt's calendar are vacated. This case is TERMINATED, with the parties to bear their own costs. Any Plaintiff wishing to appeal this judgment must file a notice of appeal with this Court within 30 days of the entry of judgment. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). (MAS, ilcd)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/28/2014. (MAS, ilcd)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 OPINION: (1) Defendants' motion for an in camera inspection is granted 141 . Based on an in camera review, the Court concludes that the following documents are protected from disclosure: Bates numbers 11, 12, 16, 19 (first three paragraphs of email), 22, 23, 24, 26, 28-45, 47, 49-50, 52, 53, 54-55, 57, 59-61, 68, 71, 74, 76, 83-84, 88-89, and 92-93. The rest of the documents are not protected and shall be produced to Plaintiffs by November 30, 2012. (2) Plaintiffs' motion to conduc t discovery is construed as a motion to supplement their Complaint with a claim challenging the movie and game policy implemented on October 4, 2012. The motion is granted 145 . (3) Discovery is closed regarding all claims except for Plaintiff� 39;s claim challenging the movie and game policy implemented on October 4, 2012. Discovery on the October 2012 policy is open and shall close on February 28, 2013. (4) Dispositive motions are due March 29, 2013.(5) Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is denied 113 , with leave to renew after discovery closes and by the dispositive motion deadline of March 29, 2013. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 11/13/12. (ME, ilcd)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 12/27/2011. Plaintiffs' motion to compel responses by Defendants Wilczynski, Oberhausen, Olt and Groot is granted in part and denied in part (d/e 71). By January 31, 2012, these Defendants are di rected to supplement their responses to interrogatories 4 and 14, in accordance with this Opinion. Plaintiffs' motion to compel information from Defendant Jumper is denied (d/e 82). Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 12/27/2011. (MAS, ilcd)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION: (1) Plaintiffs' "Motion Seeking Relief of Communication" is denied as moot. (d/e 54). Plaintiffs may use the U.S. mail to communicate with each other if they are unable to personally interact. (2) Plaintiffs' "Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint" is granted to the extent it seeks to add Alfreda Kibby as a defendant in her official capacity. (d/e 55). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d), Alfredy Kibby is substituted for Defendant Phillips in his official capacity as Director. Phillips remains as a defendant in his individual capacity. (3) The request by Plaintiff Lewis to have everyone stop sending mail in this case to Mr. Simon is denied (d/e 67). Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 9/21/11. (ME, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Telford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L G Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fleenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Isbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry J Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shan Jumper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Groot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Wilczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Oberhausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Olt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All other Liberty Employees who are in direct violation complainted of herein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?