Leland v. Hubbard et al
Plaintiff: |
Fred Leland |
Defendant: |
. Hubbard and Debera Fuqua |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv03232 |
Filed: |
July 25, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of Illinois |
Office: |
Springfield Office |
County: |
Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Byron G. Cudmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Sue E. Myerscough |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
58
OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Defendants' motions for summary judgment on exhaustion are denied (d/es 42 , 47 ). By January 31, 2013, the parties shall provide to each other the initial disclosures descri bed in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(i)-(ii). Plaintiff's expert disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) are due February 28, 2013. Defendants' expert disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.26(a)(2) are due March 29, 2013. Discover y closes June 28, 2013. Dispositive motions are due July 31, 2013. A final pretrial conference is scheduled for January 6, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. by personal appearance of Plaintiff and Defense counsel. The jury trial is scheduled on the Courts trailing trial calendar for February 4, 2014, at 9:00 a.m.. The actual date for jury selection and jury trial will be finalized at the final pretrial conference. Entered on 01/03/2013. (DM, ilcd)
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing
40
OPINION: (1) Plaintiff's motion to disclose medical records is granted (d/e 34 ). By June 25, 2012, Defendants are directed to produce to Plaintiff all of His medical records from January 1, 2010 to the date of this order, which are in their possession or control. In lieu of production, Defendants may file appropriate objections to this order by June 11, 2012. (2) Plaintiff's motions for the appointment of counsel are denied (d/e's 35 , 38 ), with leave to renew. (3) Th e motion to substitute attorney by Defendant Fuqua is granted (d/e 39 ). (4) Defendant Hubbard's unopposed motion for a protective order is granted (d/e 30 ). The clerk is directed to affix the Court's electronic signature to the order and to docket the order. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 5/31/2012. (ME, ilcd)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing
12
OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 9/22/2011. The Court vacates its order directing service by the Marshals. This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for entry of a Scheduling Order directing service per the standard procedures and setting a Rule 16 conference date. Plaintiff's petition for a writ of mandamus is denied (d/e 10). Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction or temporary restraining order is denied (d/e 11). (MAS, ilcd)
|
August 5, 2011 |
Filing
6
OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 8/5/2011. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A, the Court finds that Plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to his serious medical need for his prescribed eye drops. A status hearing is scheduled for 8/22/2011 at 9:30 a.m. by telephone conference. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied as premature (d/e 3). (MAS, ilcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?