March 13, 2015 |
Filing
119
OPINION: (1) Plaintiff's motion for an interlocutory appeal or a Rule 54(b) judgment is denied 111 . (2) This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins for settlement discussions. (3) Defendants' motion for an extension is g ranted in part and denied in part 116 . Defendants' motion to extend their expert disclosure and report deadline for 15 days, to April 15, 2015, is granted. Plaintiff shall have until April 30, 2015, to depose Defendants' expert. All ot her discovery closes on April 15, 2015. The summary judgment deadline is vacated. (4) The final pretrial is rescheduled to Friday, May 8, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Defense counsel shall appear in person. Plaintiff's counsel may appear in person or b y video. (5) The jury trial remains scheduled for June 2, 2015, at 9:00 a.m.(6) The Court will send out a revised, updated version of its proposed jury instructions. Alternate or additional instructions (no duplicates) are due May 1, 2015. (7) An agreed final pretrial order is due May 1, 2015.(8) Motions in limine are due May 1, 2015. (9) The clerk is directed to forward this order to Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/13/2015. (ME, ilcd)
|
December 29, 2014 |
Filing
106
OPINION: Defendants' motion to dismiss Count III is granted 92 . A hearing on the remaining motions is set for 2:30 p.m. on January 8, 2015 by video conference. Local counsel may appear in person or by video conference. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 12/29/2014. (ME, ilcd)
|
January 2, 2013 |
Filing
44
OPINION: Defendant Fuqua's motion for summary judgment is granted (d/e 38 ). Defendant Dr. Baker's motion for summary judgment is denied (d/e 36 ), with leave to renew by February 28, 2013. The final pretrial conference is rescheduled to June 3, 2013 at 1:30 p.m.. The trial date is vacated, to be rescheduled at the final pretrial conference. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 1/2/13. (MJ, ilcd)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
14
ORDER: 1) The status conference set for January 23, 2012, is cancelled. 2) Defendants' Answers are due January 27, 2012. 3) Within 60 days of the entry of this order, the parties shall provide to each other the initial disclosures described in F ed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(i)-(ii). 4) Plaintiff shall disclose expert witnesses and expert testimony pursuant to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by February 29, 2012. 5) Defendants shall disclose expert witnesses and expert testimony pursu ant to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by March 30, 2012. 6) Discovery closes June 8, 2012. 7) Dispositive motions are due July 9, 2012. 8) Plaintiff's incarceration limits him to written discovery. Written discovery must be serve d on a party at least 30 days before the discovery deadline. 9) A final pretrial conference is scheduled for April 15, 2013, at 1:30 p.m.. Defendants' counsel shall appear in person. Plaintiff shall appear by video. The parties are directed t o submit an agreed, proposed final pretrial order by April 8, 2013. 10) Jury selection and the jury trial are scheduled for May 7, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. before this Court in Springfield, Illinois. See written Opinion. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 12/7/2011.(MJ, ilcd)
|
October 11, 2011 |
Filing
5
OPINION: Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A, the Court finds that Plaintiff states an Eighth Amendment claim for deliberate indifference to his serious medical needs. This case is referred to the Magistrate Ju dge for entry of a Scheduling Order directing service and setting a Rule 16 conference date. A copy of this Opinion shall be served with the Complaint and Scheduling Order. Defendants shall file an answer within the time prescribed by Local Rule. The merit review scheduled for October 17, 2011, is cancelled. See written Opinion. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/11/2011. (MJ, ilcd)
|