Jump v. Montgomery County et al

Plaintiff: Kari Jump
Defendant: Montgomery County, Jim Vazzi, Rick Robbins, Kurt Eller, Rick Furlong and Doug White
Case Number: 3:2013cv03084
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins, RE: Hearing held November 13, 2015. (LB, ilcd)
October 29, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: The Defendants' Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's Order (d/e 85 )is DENIED. The Magistrate Judge's Opinion and Order Quashing the Subpoenato AT&T Communications of Illinois (d/e 81 ) is AFFIRMED. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 10/29/2015. (ME, ilcd) Added relationship to d/e 81 - Modified on 10/29/2015 (ME, ilcd).
October 6, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and to Compel 84 ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
September 30, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel Rule 35 Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff 87 ALLOWED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
August 21, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff and Movants' Motion to Quash Subpoena 78 and Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Quash as to Pegasus 80 are ALLOWED. The request to quash the Defendants' subpoena directed to Pegasus Travel Agency is WITHDRAWN. The Defendants' subpoena directed to AT&T Communications of Illinois is QUASHED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
July 27, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendants' Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Records Subpoena to the ICRMT 70 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
June 26, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Depositions 60 , Defendants' Emergency Motion to Compel Depositions and for Sanctions 62 , and Movant James Jump and Rita Holzkn echt's Motion to Quash Defendants' Subpoenas 65 are ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplement in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Depositions 63 is ALLOWED; and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Depositions 68 is DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
October 9, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION (See Written Opinion): The Defendants' Motion under Rule 12(b)(6) to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [d/e 22 ] is DENIED. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 10/09/2014. (VM, ilcd) Modified on 10/9/2014 (VM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jump v. Montgomery County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Jump
Represented By: Dana L Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Vazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Eller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?