Martin et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Randolph Martin and Catherine Fox Martin
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2013cv03130
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
County: Sangamon
Presiding Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Sue E. Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 1996, 1997, and 2001 Claims for Refund (d/e 64 ) is DENIED. This case is set for a Final Pretrial Conference on March 6, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. This case is set for Bench Trial on March 21, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (SEE WRITTEN OPINION.) Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 1/5/2017. (GL, ilcd)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Donald Mallette's Objection to Subpoena 49 is ALLOWED; Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 50 is DENIED; Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 53 is DENIED. See written order. (Copy of Opinion sent this date via U.S. Mail to Donald Mallette, Miscellaneous Party, at his listed address.) (LB, ilcd)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION (SEE WRITTEN OPINION): For the reasons stated, the United States of America's Motion to Dismiss (d/e 13 ) is DENIED. The Court, in its discretion, grants Plaintiffs Randolph Martin and Catherine Martin an extension of time to effectu ate proper service on the United States of America. Plaintiffs are directed to comply with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by properly serving the United States Attorney General and the United States Attorney for the Central District of Illinois by July 28, 2014. Plaintiffs are placed on notice that failure to comply with this directive will result in dismissal of this action. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 7/14/2014. (VM, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Fox Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?