CQuest America, Inc. v. Yahasoft, Inc.
Plaintiff: CQuest America, Inc.
Defendant: Yahasoft, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv03349
Filed: October 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
County: Sangamon
Presiding Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 6/28/16. There are genuine issues of material fact regarding aspects of the contract and whether it was modified which preclude the entry of summary judgment. Ergo, the Motion of Plaintiff CQuest America, Inc. for Summary Judgment 34 is DENIED as to the breach of contract and/or breach of a modified contract claims. The Plaintiff's Motion is ALLOWED as to certain affirmative defenses, as provided in this Order. (SW, ilcd)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff CQuest America, Inc.'s Motion for Rule 37(b) Sanctions 27 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Yahasoft, Inc., is hereby ordered to produce by 8/21/2015, the source code for its Yahasoft Early Intervention Data System (YEIDS) and all modifications to YEIDS that Yahasoft made pursuant to the Software Services Agreement between the parties. This material shall be produced in its native format, and shall be produced subject to the Protective Order entered 1/7/2015 24 . The Motion is otherwise DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel 16 ALLOWED IN PART. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CQuest America, Inc. v. Yahasoft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CQuest America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M Birndorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahasoft, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Eastham Lehner
Represented By: Randall L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?