Cross v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: |
Daniel Cross |
Defendant: |
Thomas Baker, R Mills, C Fessler and M Worley |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv03160 |
Filed: |
May 21, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Central District of Illinois |
Office: |
Springfield Office |
County: |
Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Sue E. Myerscough |
Presiding Judge: |
Tom Schanzle-Haskins |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 29, 2015 |
Filing
51
SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPINION: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 41 is DENIED. An evidentiary hearing is scheduled for OCTOBER 22, 2015 at 9:30 a.m., at the U.S. Courthouse in Springfield, Illinois. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Sanctions 48 is DENIED at this time. Plaintiff's Motion 26 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 37 is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time 32 is GRANTED. Plaintiff 9;s Motion to Withdraw Against Two Defendants 27 is GRANTED. Case is dismissed against Defendants Fessler and Worley. Clerk is directed to terminate these defendants. Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Issue Subpoena 28 is DENIED at this time. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment motions is GRANTED 49 . (SEE WRITTEN SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPINION). Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/29/2015. (GL, ilcd)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
6
MERIT REVIEW OPINION: The clerk is directed to attempt service onDefendants pursuant to the standard procedures. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The Clerk is directed to add Wexford Health Sources, Inc. as a Defendant. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Rule 16 Deadline 10/24/2014. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 8/25/2014. (GL, ilcd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?