Willis v. State of Illinois et al

Plaintiff: Maceo G Willis, Jr
Defendant: State of Illinois, Rushville Treatment and Detention Center, Gregg Scott, Dale Kunkle, Rooming Committee, Bednarz and . Williamson
Case Number: 3:2015cv03037
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
County: Schuyler
Presiding Judge: Sue E. Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 OPINION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 2/7/2018. Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's sur-reply to Defendants' reply is GRANTED, d/e 136 . The motion for summary judgment by Defendants Caraway and Reid on Plaintiff's procedural due process claim is GRANTED, d/e 131 . Defendant Reid is terminated from the case. A status conference is set by video conference for 2/27/2018, at 10:00 a.m. (SEE WRITTEN OPINION)(MAS, ilcd)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OPINION BY SUE E. MYERSCOUGH, U.S. District Judge: Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel is denied ( 123 ). The motion to strike Plaintiff's sur-reply is denied as unnecessary ( 124 ). Plaintiff's pleading does not present new arguments or facts. The motions for summary judgment are granted in part and denied in part ( 65 , 76 ). By March 13, 2017, Plaintiff is directed to file an affidavit stating, under penalty of perjury, the restrictions placed on him on his 30 days of close status imposed on December 17, 2014. In particular, Plaintiff must state whether he was allowed out of his room daily and for how long, whether he was provided an opportunity for visits and to make outgoing phone calls, and whether he was provided access to the commissary, a three-day change of clothing, and showers. The clerk is directed to notify the Magistrate Judge of the referral of this case for a settlement conference. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Bednarz. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered on 2/22/2017. (MJC, ilcd)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MERIT REVIEW OPINION: (Rule 16 Deadline 8/3/2015.) The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to add the following persons as Defen dants: Sharlene Caraway, Joseph Hankins, and J.R. Reid. Defendants State of Illinois, Rushville Treatment and Detention Center, and Rooming Committee are dismissed because they are not appropriate Defendants in this action. The clerk is directed to terminate the State of Illinois, the Rushville Treatment and Detention Center, and the Rooming Committee. The Clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendants pursuant to the standard procedures. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/3/2015. (MJ, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. State of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maceo G Willis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushville Treatment and Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rooming Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bednarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?