Whitchurch v. Canton Marine Towing Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Kori Whitchurch
Defendant: Canton Marine Towing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03278
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Sue E. Myerscough
Presiding Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim 57 is GRANTED. Defendant Canton Marine's Second Amended Counterclaim 56 is DISMISSED without prejudice. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 06/29/2018. (SKN, ilcd)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim (d/e 48 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Canton Marine's Amended Counterclaim (d/e 39 ) against Plaintiff is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. Canton Marine is given 30 days from the date of this Order to file a second amended counterclaim. SEE WRITTEN OPINION> Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 01/31/2018. (SKN, ilcd)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION: Defendant Canton Marine Towing Co., Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Rebecca Summary (d/e 34) is DENIED. Dr. Summary's opinions will not be barred in limine. The Court, however, will continue to perform its gatekeeping function in light of the evidence proven to it as the fact finder at the bench trial. In re Salem, 465 F.3d at 777. (SEE WRITTEN OPINION.) Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 11/28/2017. (GL, ilcd)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant Canton Marine Towing Co., Inc.'s Motion to Quash 27 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff Kori Whitchurch's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses 13 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Canton Marine Towing Co., Inc. is ordered to produce all addit ional answers to interrogatories and all additional responsive documents, and the revised privilege log required by this Opinion by April 4, 2017. If the parties cannot thereafter resolve Defendant's claims of privilege, Plaintiff may renew its Motion. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitchurch v. Canton Marine Towing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kori Whitchurch
Represented By: Roy C Dripps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canton Marine Towing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?