Valencia et al v. City of Springfield, Illinois
Plaintiff: Mary B. Valencia and Individual Advocacy Group, Inc.
Defendant: City of Springfield, Illinois
Case Number: 3:2016cv03331
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
County: Sangamon
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Presiding Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 OPINION: The First Motion in Limine of Defendant City of Springfield to Bar Plaintiff United States of America's Disclosed Expert d/e 86 is DENIED with leave to refile in the event any inadmissible testimony is offered at trial. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 04/09/2020. (SKN, ilcd)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 OPINION: The Motion of Defendant City of Springfield for Partial Summary Judgment on the issues of standing and damages (d/e 89 ) is DENIED. The Motion of Plaintiffs Individual Advocacy Group, Mary B. Valencia, as the Independent Administrator of t he Estate of A.D., and B.A. for Partial Summary Judgment as to the liability of Defendant City of Springfield [d/e 92] is GRANTED. The Motion of Defendant City of Springfield to Strike Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion (d/e 97 ) is DENIED. SEE Written Opinion. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 3/16/2020. (ME, ilcd)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION: The Motion of Plaintiff United States of America for Summary Judgment as to the liability of Defendant City of Springfield 91 is GRANTED.The Clerk will terminate the duplicative Motion for Summary Judgment 27 filed in Case Number 17-3278 . The Defendant City of Springfield's Motion for Summary Judgment 88 is DENIED. The Clerk will terminate the duplicative Motion for Summary Judgment 26 filed in Case Number 17-3278. Within 90 days of the entry of this Order, the City of Springfield shall submit a plan to remediate its violations of the Fair Housing Act. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 03/02/2020. (SKN, ilcd)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel 50 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part; Defendant's Motion for Protective Order 55 is DENIED. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION: Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 7 is allowed.The City of Springfield is hereby enjoined from instituting evictionproceedings against the Plaintiffs in order to permit continued operation of the three-person home for p ersons with disabilities at 2328 Noble Avenue, while this case is pending. This case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins for a scheduling conference. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 08/02/2017. (SKN, ilcd)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION: Defendant's Motion to Proceed with Discovery Prior to a Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12 is DENIED. The Defendant is Directed to file a response to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injuncti on by May 16, 2017. The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on May 18, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. is Canceled, pending resolution of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered by Judge Richard Mills on 05/08/2017. (SKN, ilcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia et al v. City of Springfield, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B. Valencia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Hunt
Represented By: Thomas E Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Individual Advocacy Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Jane Hunt
Represented By: Thomas E Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield, Illinois
Represented By: Linda Ann O'Brien
Represented By: Steven C Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?