BRASHER et al v. Quincy Properties LLC, doing business as Welcome Inn et al

Plaintiff: APRIL R. BRASHER and RICHARD M. ORENCIA
Defendant: Quincy Properties LLC, doing business as Welcome Inn, Welcome Inn Hotel Management, Inc., Brett Burge, Kenneth Logan, Quentin Kearney and Joe Wimberly
Case Number: 3:2017cv03022
Filed: January 28, 2017
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Sue E. Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2018 137 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 04/24/2018. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. The parties' Joint Motion for Conditional Certification of Collective Action and Court Guidance on Class Notice (d/e 132 ) is GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: (1) The Court conditionally certifies a collective action by Plaintiffs and similarly situated members of the class pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b), defined as: All current and former employees of Defendants who were: classified as s alaried/exempt during the Class Period who held the position or performed the duties of housekeeper, maintenance staff, front desk personnel, skilled trade construction employee, or placing advertising; or classified as salaried/exempt and were not paid a minimum salary of $455 per week. (2) The Court APPROVES Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice of Pending Lawsuit, as amended herein; Plaintiffs' Consent to Sue Under the Fair Labor Standards Act form; and Plaintiffs' Proposed Text Notice, as amended herein; (3) The Court AUTHORIZES Plaintiffs to send the approved notice to the class as defined above. (4) Defendants are ordered to produce to Plaintiffs the names and aliases, home and work addresses, email addresses, and phon e numbers of every salaried/exempt employee who held the title of or performed the duties of housekeeper, housekeeper, maintenance staff, front desk personnel, skilled trade construction employee, and placing advertising after March 1, 2014, as wel l as all salaried/exempt employees who were paid less than $455 per week who worked for Defendants after March 1, 2014. (5) In light of the Joint Motion for Conditional Certification of Collective Action, the following motions are denied as m oot with leave to refile: Plaintiffs' Motion to Certification of Collective Action (d/e 5 ); Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Collective Action (d/e 82 ); Defendant American Motels Motion to Dismiss (d/e 98 ); and the Motion (d/e 102 ) to transfer venue and for a more definite statement filed by Defendants B&W Investment Properties, LLC, Brett Burge, County Line Properties I LLC, Jefferson Property, Quentin Kearning, Kenneth Logan, Quincy Property LLC, Springfield Welcome Inn, Vandiver Motel, and Joe Wimberly. (DM, ilcd)
March 8, 2018 131 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 03/07/2018. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Plaintiffs' Motion for Tolling of the Statute of Limitations for FLSA Claims of Possible Collective Members (d/e 125 ) is DENIED with leave to refile. (DM, ilcd)
September 29, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order 96 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. Motion for Protective Order 106 is DENIED as moot. See written order. (LB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRASHER et al v. Quincy Properties LLC, doing business as Welcome Inn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL R. BRASHER
Represented By: John Craig Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD M. ORENCIA
Represented By: John Craig Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Properties LLC, doing business as Welcome Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welcome Inn Hotel Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?