Miller et al v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Darin E. Miller, Illinois Carry, Illinois State Rifle Association and Jennifer J. Miller
Defendant: Beverly J. Walker and Lisa Madigan
Case Number: 3:2018cv03085
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Shelby
0 Judge: Sue E Myerscough
1 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2018 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) filed by Plaintiffs Illinois Carry, Illinois State Rifle Association, Darin E. Miller, Jennifer J. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Sigale, David)
July 9, 2018 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for More Definite Statement #10 , to which Defendants' counsel does not object, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement #9 by Thursday, July 19, 2018. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 7/9/2018. (MJC, ilcd)
July 6, 2018 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) (Agreed) by Plaintiffs Illinois Carry, Illinois State Rifle Association, Darin E. Miller, Jennifer J. Miller, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sigale, David)
June 20, 2018 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) by Defendants Lisa Madigan, Beverly J. Walker. Responses due by 7/5/2018 (Greenspan, Barbara)
May 11, 2018 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Agreed Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Answer #8 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 6/20/2018 for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead. (LB, ilcd)
May 11, 2018 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Lisa Madigan, Beverly J. Walker. Responses due by 5/25/2018 (Greenspan, Barbara)
May 10, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Barbara Lynn Greenspan on behalf of Lisa Madigan, Beverly J. Walker (Greenspan, Barbara)
April 20, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lisa Madigan, in her official capacity on 04/20/2018, filed by Jennifer J. Miller, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Darin E. Miller, Illinois Carry., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer J. Miller, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Darin E. Miller, Illinois Carry. Lisa Madigan served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. (Sigale, David)
April 20, 2018 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Beverly J. Walker, in official capacity on 04/20/2018, filed by Jennifer J. Miller, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Darin E. Miller, Illinois Carry., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer J. Miller, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Darin E. Miller, Illinois Carry. Beverly J. Walker served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. (Sigale, David)
April 17, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Lisa Madigan, Beverly J. Walker. Originals mailed to attorney for service. (MJC, ilcd)
April 16, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David G Sigale on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sigale, David)
April 16, 2018 2 NOTICE (Civil Cover Sheet) re #1 Complaint (Sigale, David)
April 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2817034.), filed by Jennifer J. Miller, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Darin E. Miller, Illinois Carry.(Sigale, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: David G Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin E. Miller
Represented By: David G Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Carry
Represented By: David G Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois State Rifle Association
Represented By: David G Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer J. Miller
Represented By: David G Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly J. Walker
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?