Cox v. Simmons
Petitioner: Christopher J Cox
Respondent: Doug Simmons
Undetermined: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv03059
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher J Cox to Lincoln Correctional Center (SKR, ilcd)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/11/19. Respondent's Motion to Substitute Attorney #7 is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to substitute Michael L. Cebula for Retha Stotts as Respondent's attorney of record in this case. (SKR, ilcd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael L Cebula on behalf of Doug Simmons (Cebula, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Retha Stotts to be replaced by Michael Cebula, by Respondent Doug Simmons. Responses due by 4/25/2019 (Cebula, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion To Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition As Successive filed by Petitioner Christopher J Cox. (SKR, ilcd)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 12(C) NOTICE to plaintiff entered re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion To Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition As Successive (SKR, ilcd)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion To Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition As Successive by Respondent Doug Simmons. Responses due by 3/26/2019 (Stotts, Retha)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Retha Stotts on behalf of Doug Simmons (Stotts, Retha)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/7/19. Respondent, Doug Simmons, has sixty (60) days to file a response to the Petition. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. ( Other Deadline set for 5/6/2019.)(SKR, ilcd)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5; receipt 34626011171) filed by Christopher J Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (KM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doug Simmons
Represented By: Retha Stotts
Represented By: Michael L Cebula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher J Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?